This case was last updated from PACER on 11/22/2020 at 08:18:13 (UTC).

White v. Saul

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 White filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Hildy Bowbeer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-02036

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Hildy Bowbeer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zenobia White

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward C. Olson

Attorney at Attorney at Law

331 2Nd Ave S. Ste 420

Mpls, MN 55401

Karl E. Osterhout

Attorney at Osterhout Disability Law, LLC

521 Cedar Way, Suite 200

Oakmont, PA 15139

Defendant Attorney

Marisa Silverman

Attorney at SSA-Ogc

1301 Young Street, Ste A702

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/30/2020. (JMK) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Silverman on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Silverman, Marisa) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (CLK) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/30/2020. (JMK) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Karl E. Osterhout for Zenobia White. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/25/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docket(#6) (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (MTP) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer per Social Security List. Please use case number 20-cv-02036 HB. (MTP) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karl E. Osterhout. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8081683 filed by Zenobia White. (Olson, Edward) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Zenobia White. (Olson, Edward) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Zenobia White. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Olson, Edward) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less