This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2020 at 11:21:03 (UTC).

White v. Saul

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 White filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M. Burgess. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00166

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy M. Burgess

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bonnie Dianne White

Defendants

Andrew Saul

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin Sean Kerr

Attorney at Schneider Kerr Law Offices

P.O. Box 14490

Portland, OR 97293

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Service to be completed within 90 days; Clerk to issue summonses and send to plaintiff; Answer due 60 days after receipt. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 7/16/2020. (JDS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JDS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Service to be completed within 90 days; Clerk to issue summonses and send to plaintiff; Answer due 60 days after receipt. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 7/16/2020. (JDS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Andrew Saul, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bonnie Dianne White.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Bonnie Dianne White.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin S Kerr