This case was last updated from PACER on 12/23/2019 at 08:13:41 (UTC).

White v. Paychex, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 White filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Paychex, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. deGravelles and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00735

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher White

Defendants

Paychex Inc.

Paychex North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

G. Karl Bernard

Attorney at G. Karl Bernard & Associates, LLC

1615 Poydras Street, Suite 101

New Orleans, LA 70112

Defendant Attorneys

M. Rebecca Cooper

Attorney at The Kullman Firm

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1600

New Orleans, LA 70163

Christine S. Keenan

Attorney at The Kullman Firm

4605 Bluebonnet Blvd., Suite A

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 12/10/2019. (ELW) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

10 #1

Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Paychex North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Keenan, Christine) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Paychex North America, Inc., filed by Christopher White.(SWE) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

7 #2

Proposed Pleading;

7 #1

Attachment

#7

(#7) Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Amended Complaint by Christopher White. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Bernard, G.) Modified on 12/9/2019 to edit text (LT). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) Joint STATUS REPORT by Christopher White. (Bernard, G.) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

5 #4

Proposed Pleading;

5 #3

Proposed Pleading;

5 #2

Proposed Pleading;

5 #1

Proposed Pleading;

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Christopher White. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Proposed Pleading;, #4 Proposed Pleading;)(Bernard, G.) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

3 #2

Memorandum in Support

3 #1

Exhibit 1 EEOC Charge

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Paychex Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 EEOC Charge, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Keenan, Christine) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit Removal Exhibits w State Court Record

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • (#12) Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference is set for 12/12/2019 is CANCELED. The court will issue a separate scheduling order in this matter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 12/10/2019. (ELW) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Paychex North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Keenan, Christine) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Paychex North America, Inc., filed by Christopher White.(SWE) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Amended Complaint filed by Christopher White. The Clerk of Court shall docket R. Doc. 7-2 into the record, which shall become the operative complaint in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by no later than December 13, 2019, Paychex Inc. shall file a motion to withdraw the pending #3 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition for Damages as the operative complaint has changed. The withdrawal is without prejudice to refiling a Motion to Dismiss related to the operative complaint should Paychex Inc. choose to do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Amended Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Amended Complaint by Christopher White. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Bernard, G.) Modified on 12/9/2019 to edit text (LT). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Joint STATUS REPORT by Christopher White. (Bernard, G.) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Christopher White. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Proposed Pleading;, #4 Proposed Pleading;)(Bernard, G.) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Paychex Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 EEOC Charge, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Keenan, Christine) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • (#2) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 11/29/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/24/2019. (BLR) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 686,106. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2021218), filed by Paychex North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Removal Exhibits w State Court Record)(Keenan, Christine) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/24/2019) (EDC). Modified on 10/24/2019 to rotate pages. (EDC). (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less