This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:14:35 (UTC).

White v. Mcmillon et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 White filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Mcmillon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ed Kinkeade and Renee Harris Toliver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02980

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ed Kinkeade

Referral Judge

Renee Harris Toliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timothy Jamal White

Waxachachie, TX 75165

Defendants

Kevin Strenght

Chares Edge

Wade Goldsby

NFN Stephens

Doug Mcmillon

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Judge's Questionnaire sent to Thomas Jamal White. Responses due by 1/16/2020. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 12/19/2019) (chmb) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#1

(#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Chares Edge, Wade Goldsby, Doug Mcmillon, NFN Stephens, Kevin Strenght filed by Timothy Jamal White. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (oyh) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (oyh) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and for Collection and Payment of Full Filing Fee. Plaintiff shall pay $350.00 in monthly installments as mandated by the PLRA. No process will issue pending completion of screening. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 12/19/2019) (chmb) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE filed by Timothy Jamal White re: #6 Judge's Questionnaire. (axm) (Entered: 01/11/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account. filed by Timothy Jamal White. (oyh) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE filed by Timothy Jamal White re: #6 Judge's Questionnaire. (axm) (Entered: 01/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Fri Dec 20 11:33:52 CST 2019 (crt) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Thu Dec 19 17:15:19 CST 2019 (crt) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Judge's Questionnaire sent to Thomas Jamal White. Responses due by 1/16/2020. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 12/19/2019) (chmb) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and for Collection and Payment of Full Filing Fee. Plaintiff shall pay $350.00 in monthly installments as mandated by the PLRA. No process will issue pending completion of screening. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 12/19/2019) (chmb) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Wed Dec 18 11:14:18 CST 2019 (crt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account. filed by Timothy Jamal White. (oyh) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against Chares Edge, Wade Goldsby, Doug Mcmillon, NFN Stephens, Kevin Strenght filed by Timothy Jamal White. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (oyh) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (oyh) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.