Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2021 at 07:54:51 (UTC).

White v. Kroger Texas, L.P.

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 White filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Kroger Texas, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Hittner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01512

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Hittner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberly White

Defendant

Kroger Texas, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Albert Williams, III

Attorney at Daspit Law Firm, PLLC

440 Louisiana St., Ste. 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Kiernan Angus McAlpine

Attorney at Daspit Law Firm

440 Louisiana, Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Adraon DelJohn Greene

Attorney at Galloway Johnson Tompkins Burr And Smith

1301 Mckinney St, Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77010

Juvie A Cardenas

Attorney at Galloway Johnson Tompkins et al

1301 Mckinney Drive, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) DESIGNATION of Kiernan McAlpine as attorney in charge of Kimberly White, filed.(McAlpine, Kiernan) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Kroger Texas, L.P., filed.(Cardenas, Juvie) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kroger Texas, L.P., filed.(Cardenas, Juvie) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 7/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray, filed. (jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

1 #9

Exhibit Exh E-4

1 #8

Exhibit Exh E-3

1 #7

Exhibit Exh E-2

1 #6

Exhibit Exh E-1

1 #5

Exhibit Exh E

1 #4

Exhibit Exh D

1 #3

Exhibit Exh C

1 #2

Exhibit Exh B

1 #1

Exhibit Exh A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 333rd District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-87934 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26400387) filed by Kroger Texas, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A, #2 Exhibit Exh B, #3 Exhibit Exh C, #4 Exhibit Exh D, #5 Exhibit Exh E, #6 Exhibit Exh E-1, #7 Exhibit Exh E-2, #8 Exhibit Exh E-3, #9 Exhibit Exh E-4)(Greene, Adraon) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DESIGNATION of Kiernan McAlpine as attorney in charge of Kimberly White, filed.(McAlpine, Kiernan) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Kroger Texas, L.P., filed.(Cardenas, Juvie) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kroger Texas, L.P., filed.(Cardenas, Juvie) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 7/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray, filed. (jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 333rd District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-87934 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26400387) filed by Kroger Texas, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A, #2 Exhibit Exh B, #3 Exhibit Exh C, #4 Exhibit Exh D, #5 Exhibit Exh E, #6 Exhibit Exh E-1, #7 Exhibit Exh E-2, #8 Exhibit Exh E-3, #9 Exhibit Exh E-4)(Greene, Adraon) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kroger Texas LP is a litigant