This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 09:47:22

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 a Prisoner - Prison Condition case was filed by White against Hines in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 5:19-CV-00750
  • Filing Date 05/17/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Prisoner - Prison Condition
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala
  • Courthouse Alabama Northern District

Party Details

  • Defendant Scott A Schuttinga
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Eric W Hines
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Reginald White, Jr
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER that the court having received prisoner consent f...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) PRISONER CONSENT FORM filed by Reginald White, Jr. (KEK...

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) ORDER - The plaintiff has submitted an application to p...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Regina...

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Eric W Hines, Scott A Schuttinga, fil...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • (#5) ORDER that the court having received prisoner consent form the Warden is directed to deduct Monthly Payments from Prison Account of Reginald White Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/31/2019. (KEK) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
  • 05/30/2019
  • (#4) PRISONER CONSENT FORM filed by Reginald White, Jr. (KEK) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
  • 05/20/2019
  • (#3) ORDER - The plaintiff has submitted an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by certified copies of his prison account statements. (Doc. #2 ). The application is GRANTED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). The undersigned therefore ORDERS the plaintiff to sign and return to the Clerk of Court, within thirty (30) days of the entry date of this Order, the attached Prisoner Consent Form to signify that he wishes to continue with this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/20/2019. (KEK) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Reginald White, Jr. (KEK) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Eric W Hines, Scott A Schuttinga, filed by Reginald White, Jr.(KEK) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.