This case was last updated from PACER on 09/02/2021 at 20:24:05 (UTC).

White v. Google, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 White filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Google, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian M. Cogan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04910

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian M. Cogan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas J. White

Defendant

Google, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gabrielle Vinci

Attorney at Nesenoff & Miltenberg LLP

363 Seventh Avenue, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10001

Andrew T. Miltenberg

Attorney at Nesenoff & Miltenberg, LLP

363 Seventh Avenue, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10001

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#7

(#7) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Google, LLC. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#5

(#5) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint, Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet by Thomas J. White (Miltenberg, Andrew) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Gabrielle Vinci on behalf of Thomas J. White (aty to be noticed) (Vinci, Gabrielle) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint by Thomas J. White (Miltenberg, Andrew) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Thomas J. White (Miltenberg, Andrew) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Thomas J. White filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14799652 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Thomas J. White. (Miltenberg, Andrew) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 10/14/2021 at 9:30 am. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 4910#. The parties are directed to comply with the attached mandatory requirements including filing on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/2/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Google, LLC. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint, Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet by Thomas J. White (Miltenberg, Andrew) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page must be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Gabrielle Vinci on behalf of Thomas J. White (aty to be noticed) (Vinci, Gabrielle) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint by Thomas J. White (Miltenberg, Andrew) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Thomas J. White (Miltenberg, Andrew) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Thomas J. White filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14799652 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Thomas J. White. (Miltenberg, Andrew) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Miltenberg