This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2023 at 11:27:45 (UTC).

White v. GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 White filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against GlaxoSmithKline America Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-14024

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jacqueline White

Defendants

GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC

Ajanta Pharma USA Inc.

Apotex Corporation

Appco Pharma LLC

Auro Health LLC

Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.

Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc.

Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp.

Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc., USA

Golden State Medical Supply, Inc.

L. Perrigo Co.

Novitium Pharma LLC

Ranbaxy Inc.

Sandoz Inc.

Strides Pharma, Inc.

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roopal Premchand Luhana

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jacqueline White. Denton Pharma Inc. waiver sent on 3/9/2023, response/answer due 5/8/2023. (Luhana, Roopal) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jacqueline White. Apotex Corporation waiver sent on 3/9/2023, response/answer due 5/8/2023. (Luhana, Roopal) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jacqueline White. Appco Pharma LLC waiver sent on 3/17/2023, response/answer due 5/16/2023. (Luhana, Roopal) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. Case is stayed and closed per Pretrial Order #80 in 20-MD-2924-RLR. (vjk) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • Docket(#2) MDL 2924 Judge Assignment with Tag-Along Case Receipt from the Southern District of Florida. Judge Robin L. Rosenberg assigned FLSD Case Number 3:23-cv-14024. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-MD-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified. (vjk) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Jaqueline White against Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Ajanta Pharma USA Inc., Apotex Corporation, Appco Pharma LLC, Auro Health LLC, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Denton Pharma Inc. d/b/a Northwind Pharmaceuticals, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp., GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc., USA, Golden State Medical Supply, Inc., L. Perrigo Co., Novitium Pharma LLC, Ranbaxy Inc., Sandoz Inc., Strides Pharma, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. f/k/a Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceticals U.S.A., Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Wockhardt USA LLC, Wockhardt USA, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16361680, filed by Jacqueline White. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Luhana, Roopal) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less