3:23-CV-14024
02/24/2023
Disposed - Other Disposed
Personal Injury - Other Product Liability
Robin L. Rosenberg
Jacqueline White
GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Ajanta Pharma USA Inc.
Apotex Corporation
Appco Pharma LLC
Auro Health LLC
Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.
Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc.
Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc., USA
Golden State Medical Supply, Inc.
L. Perrigo Co.
Novitium Pharma LLC
Ranbaxy Inc.
Sandoz Inc.
Strides Pharma, Inc.
Roopal Premchand Luhana
Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jacqueline White. Denton Pharma Inc. waiver sent on 3/9/2023, response/answer due 5/8/2023. (Luhana, Roopal) (Entered: 04/14/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jacqueline White. Apotex Corporation waiver sent on 3/9/2023, response/answer due 5/8/2023. (Luhana, Roopal) (Entered: 04/10/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jacqueline White. Appco Pharma LLC waiver sent on 3/17/2023, response/answer due 5/16/2023. (Luhana, Roopal) (Entered: 03/30/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Terminated. Case is stayed and closed per Pretrial Order #80 in 20-MD-2924-RLR. (vjk) (Entered: 03/08/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) MDL 2924 Judge Assignment with Tag-Along Case Receipt from the Southern District of Florida. Judge Robin L. Rosenberg assigned FLSD Case Number 3:23-cv-14024. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-MD-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified. (vjk) (Entered: 03/08/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT Jaqueline White against Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Ajanta Pharma USA Inc., Apotex Corporation, Appco Pharma LLC, Auro Health LLC, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Denton Pharma Inc. d/b/a Northwind Pharmaceuticals, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp., GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc., USA, Golden State Medical Supply, Inc., L. Perrigo Co., Novitium Pharma LLC, Ranbaxy Inc., Sandoz Inc., Strides Pharma, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. f/k/a Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceticals U.S.A., Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Wockhardt USA LLC, Wockhardt USA, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16361680, filed by Jacqueline White. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Luhana, Roopal) (Entered: 02/24/2023)
[-] Read Less