This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/21/2022 at 06:23:31 (UTC).

White v. Albertelli et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 White filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Albertelli. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eleanor L. Ross and Justin S. Anand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02855

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

Referral Judge

Justin S. Anand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Calvin L. White

Lithonia, GA 30038

Defendants

James E. Albertelli PA doing business as ALAW

Specialized Loan Servicing, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin Thomas Crocker

Attorney at Barron & Newburger, P.C.

P.O. Box 78701, 7320 N. Mopac Expressway

Austin, TX 78701

Matthew A. Morr

Attorney at Ballard Spahr Andrews & Ingersoll-CO

1225 17Th Street, Suite 2300

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

30 #1

*Restricted*

30 #30

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#29

(#29) ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/19/2022, re: #26 the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix is ACCEPTED. Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue [Docket No. 8] is GRANTED; and That, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#27

(#27) First MOTION for Extension of Time to Magistrate R & R by Plaintiff Calvin L. White. (White, Calvin) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#26

(#26) RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/13/2022. For the foregoing reasons, the Court respectfully RECOMMENDS that the Motion #8 be GRANTED. (alave, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#25

(#25) ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on May 27, 2022. Accordingly, based on the foregoing and the entire record in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion #22 is DENIED without prejudice.(csarr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 05/27/2022)

22 #1

Exhibit

8 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Judgment

8 #8

Main Document

1 #14

Exhibit List

1 #13

Exhibit

1 #11

Exhibit

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:21-cv-03390. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/19/2022, re: #26 the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix is ACCEPTED. Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue [Docket No. 8] is GRANTED; and That, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/27/2022 re: #27 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Magistrate R & R is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff may file an objection to the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [Docket No. #26 ] on or before July 18, 2022. Text Only Entry(pabsec, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) First MOTION for Extension of Time to Magistrate R & R by Plaintiff Calvin L. White. (White, Calvin) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/13/2022. For the foregoing reasons, the Court respectfully RECOMMENDS that the Motion #8 be GRANTED. (alave, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on May 27, 2022. Accordingly, based on the foregoing and the entire record in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion #22 is DENIED without prejudice.(csarr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE to #22 MOTION for Appointment Specialized Loan Servicing LLC's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Morr, Matthew) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MEMORANDUM regarding #22 MOTION for Appointment filed by Calvin L. White. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/16/2022. Text Only Entry (pabsec, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Appointment by Plaintiff Calvin L. White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(White, Calvin) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY to Response to #20 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Defendants' Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Defendants James E. Albertelli, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Letter)(Morr, Matthew) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kevin Thomas Crocker on behalf of James E. AlbertelliAttorney Kevin Thomas Crocker added to party James E. Albertelli(pty:dft) (Crocker, Kevin) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM regarding #8 Joint MOTION to Change Venue filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/31/2022. Text Only Entry (pabsec, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION to Change Venue by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Judgment)(Morr, Matthew) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/12/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond toComplaint #5 is GRANTED. Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the operative complaint no later than February 2, 2022.(alave, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM regarding #5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/11/2022. Text Only Entry (pabsec, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Morr, Matthew) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all motions. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/17/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (norlin, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against James E. Albertelli, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC Filing Fee: $402.00Receipt Number:COX 101486, filed by Calvin L. White. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Packet Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit List, #15 Envelope)(norlin, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where James E. Albertelli, PA doing business as Albertelli Law is a litigant

Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew A. Morr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin T Crocker