This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/08/2021 at 07:32:08 (UTC).

White Raiment L L C v. GuideOne National Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 10/09/2021 White Raiment L L C filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GuideOne National Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Patrick J Hanna. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-03559

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Patrick J Hanna

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

White Raiment, LLC

White Raiment L L C

Defendants

GuideOne National Insurance Company

GuideOne National Insurance Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian James Houghtaling

Attorney at Houghtaling Law Firm

3500 N Hullen St

Metairie, LA 70002

Defendant Attorney

Gregory Engelsman

Attorney at GuideOne Insurance

301 N Main St Ste 2296

Baton Rouge, LA 70825

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#2

#3

(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

3 #1

Exhibit A

3 #2

Exhibit B

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to GuideOne National Insurance Co. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by White Raiment L L C. GuideOne National Insurance Co served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (aty,Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by GuideOne National Insurance Co.(Attorney Gregory Engelsman added to party GuideOne National Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Engelsman, Gregory) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #6 Answer to Complaint, sent to Gregory Engelsman on behalf of GuideOne National Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/23/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GuideOne National Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent GuideOne Insurance Co, Corporate Parent GuideOne Insurance Co for GuideOne National Insurance Co. (aty,Engelsman, Gregory) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GuideOne National Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent GuideOne Insurance Co, Corporate Parent GuideOne Insurance Co for GuideOne National Insurance Co. (aty,Engelsman, Gregory) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #6 Answer to Complaint, sent to Gregory Engelsman on behalf of GuideOne National Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/23/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by GuideOne National Insurance Co.(Attorney Gregory Engelsman added to party GuideOne National Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Engelsman, Gregory) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by White Raiment L L C. GuideOne National Insurance Co served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (aty,Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to GuideOne National Insurance Co. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2021
  • DocketJudge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna added. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GuideOne National Insurance Company, requested by White Raiment, LLC. (aty,Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 10/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by White Raiment, LLC. (aty,Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 10/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against GuideOne National Insurance Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4850151) filed by White Raiment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Brian James Houghtaling added to party White Raiment, LLC(pty:pla))(aty,Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 10/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant