This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/24/2021 at 09:19:21 (UTC).

White et al v. Pine Bush Central School District et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 White filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Pine Bush Central School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Laura Taylor Swain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06347

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laura Taylor Swain

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Markisha P. White

Middletown, NY 10941

A.C.

Defendants

Pine Bush Central School District

Jessica Zukor

Patricia Fernandez

Brian Breheny

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by A.C., Markisha P. White. (mml) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 2 Complaint against Brian Breheny, Patricia Fernandez, Pine Bush Central School District, Jessica Zukor with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by A.C., Markisha P. White. Related document: 2 Complaint. (mml) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED APPLICATION FOR THE COURT TO REQUEST PRO BONO COUNSEL. Document filed by A.C., Markisha P. White. (mml) Modified on 9/21/2021 (mml). (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Markisha P. White consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Markisha P. White. (mml) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court dismisses the complaint for failure to state a claim on which relief any be granted. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). Any claims asserted on behalf of A.C. are dismissed without prejudice to any action an attorney may file representing A.C.'s interests. The Court grants Plaintiff thirty days' leave to replead her claims in an amended complaint that complieswith the standards set forth above. The Clerk of Court is instructed to hold this matter open on the docket until a civil judgment is entered. The Clerk of Court is directed to transmit a copy of this order to Plaintiff. Plaintiff hasconsented to receive electronic service of notices and documents in this action. (ECF 3.) The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/23/21) (rdz) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/4/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Markisha P. White consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Markisha P. White.(rdz) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Markisha P. White.(rdz) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A.C. is a litigant