This case was last updated from PACER on 08/02/2020 at 10:54:10 (UTC).

White et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 White filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marsha J. Pechman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00841

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marsha J. Pechman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John White

Shelli Park

Defendants

Liberty Insurance Corporation

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Todd Christopher Hayes

Attorney at HARPER HAYES PLLC

One Union Square, 600 University St Ste 2420

Seattle, WA 98101

Thomas M. Williams

Attorney at HARPER HAYES PLLC

One Union Square, 600 University St Ste 2420

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorneys

John Michael Silk

Attorney at WILSON SMITH COCHRAN & DICKERSON

901 Fifth Ave, Ste 1700

Seattle, WA 98164-2050

Sarah L Eversole

Attorney at WILSON SMITH COCHRAN & DICKERSON

901 Fifth Ave, Ste 1700

Seattle, WA 98164-2050

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 4-7. (Williams, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah L Eversole on behalf of Defendants Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Eversole, Sarah) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/13/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/30/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/6/2020. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LW) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company on 6/10/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Shelli Park, John White. (Hayes, Todd) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Liberty Insurance Corporation on 6/10/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Shelli Park, John White. (Hayes, Todd) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of summons/complaint upon Defendants; documents deposited with Federal Express on 6/9/2020 by Plaintiffs Shelli Park, John White (Hayes, Todd) Modified on 6/10/2020 to include party, method and date of service (PM). (Entered: 06/09/2020)

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SG) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Damages against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6378113), filed by John White, Shelli Park. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Hayes, Todd) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 4-7. (Williams, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney John Michael Silk for Liberty Insurance Corporation and for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company added per #7 Notice of Appearance. (LH) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah L Eversole on behalf of Defendants Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Eversole, Sarah) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/13/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/30/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/6/2020. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LW) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company on 6/10/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Shelli Park, John White. (Hayes, Todd) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Liberty Insurance Corporation on 6/10/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Shelli Park, John White. (Hayes, Todd) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of summons/complaint upon Defendants; documents deposited with Federal Express on 6/9/2020 by Plaintiffs Shelli Park, John White (Hayes, Todd) Modified on 6/10/2020 to include party, method and date of service (PM). (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SG) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketJudge Marsha J. Pechman added. (SG) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Damages against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6378113), filed by John White, Shelli Park. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Hayes, Todd) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less