This case was last updated from PACER on 05/17/2021 at 09:25:56 (UTC).

Whitaker v. Tory Burch LLC

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 Whitaker filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Tory Burch LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William B. Shubb and Allison Claire. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00494

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William B. Shubb

Referral Judge

Allison Claire

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Whitaker

Defendant

Tory Burch LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorney

Emily A. Papania

Attorney at Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease LLP

4675 Macarthur Ct., Suite 700

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/13/2021 extending time for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs Complaint on or before 5/28/2021. (Kirksey Smith, K) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Tory Burch LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Papania, Emily) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Tory Burch LLC. Attorney Papania, Emily A. added. (Papania, Emily) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Tory Burch LLC served on 3/26/2021. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

3 #2

VDRP

3 #1

Consent Form

#3

(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Tory Burch LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Amanda Lockhart Seabock* *Center for Disability Access* *8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200* *San Diego, CA 92111*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Brian Whitaker. Attorney Seabock, Amanda Lockhart added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9483956) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/13/2021 extending time for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs Complaint on or before 5/28/2021. (Kirksey Smith, K) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Tory Burch LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Papania, Emily) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Tory Burch LLC. Attorney Papania, Emily A. added. (Papania, Emily) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Tory Burch LLC served on 3/26/2021. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Tory Burch LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Amanda Lockhart Seabock* *Center for Disability Access* *8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200* *San Diego, CA 92111*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Brian Whitaker. Attorney Seabock, Amanda Lockhart added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9483956) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TORY BURCH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily Anne Papania