This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2021 at 08:38:04 (UTC).

Brian Whitaker v. The Donna Karan Company Store LLC

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 Brian Whitaker filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against The Donna Karan Company Store LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Autumn D. Spaeth and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00109

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Whitaker

Defendant

The Donna Karan Company Store LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorney

Stephanie A Sheridan

Attorney at Steptoe and Johnson LLP

One Market Plaza Suite 3900

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#12

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Donna Karan Company Store LLC answer now due 4/9/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Donna Karan Company Store LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sheridan, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause, in writing, no later than ten (10) days from the date of this Order, why the Court should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim. (See document for further information). (jp) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8- 3) filed by Defendant The Donna Karan Company Store LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Stephanie A Sheridan added to party The Donna Karan Company Store LLC(pty:dft))(Sheridan, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant The Donna Karan Company Store LLC served on 1/28/2021, answer due 2/18/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: C T Corporation System -Carlos Paz intake specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (mku) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Donna Karan Company Store LLC. (lh) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30130549 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Donna Kara Company Store, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie Sheridan