This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/20/2022 at 08:03:01 (UTC).

Whitaker v. Taste, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/21/2022 Whitaker filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Taste, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laurel Beeler and James Donato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01772

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Laurel Beeler

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Whitaker

Defendant

Taste, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Prathima Reddy Price

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Cara Patricia Townsend

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine St., Ste. 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Centery for Disability Access

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

Nathan Vern Okelberry

Attorney at Fisher Phillips

444 South Flower St

Los Angeles, CA 900071

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Brian Whitaker re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/21/2022) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/21/2022) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Taste, Inc.. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2022) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2022) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brian Whitaker.. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/23/2022) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Cara Patricia Townsend (Townsend, Cara) (Filed on 3/23/2022) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Whitaker. Taste, Inc. served on 3/28/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/7/2022) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Taste, Inc. and Brian Whitaker. (Okelberry, Nathan) (Filed on 4/20/2022) Modified on 4/21/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/20/2022)

13 #13

Main Document

13 #1

Proposed Order

13 #2

Certificate/Proof of Service

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE by Brian Whitaker for Settlement (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/18/2022) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION to Extend Site Inspection Deadline with Proposed Order filed by Brian Whitaker and Taste, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Townsend, Cara) (Filed on 5/16/2022) Modified on 5/17/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Stipulation. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #12 MOTI ON for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Taste, Inc. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2022) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Taste, Inc. and Brian Whitaker. (Okelberry, Nathan) (Filed on 4/20/2022) Modified on 4/21/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Whitaker. Taste, Inc. served on 3/28/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/7/2022) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. The Attorneys address on file does not match the Notice of Appearance, please update your ECF profile.Re: #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Brian Whi taker (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2022) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 03/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2022) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2022) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Cara Patricia Townsend (Townsend, Cara) (Filed on 3/23/2022) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brian Whitaker.. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/23/2022) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2022) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Taste, Inc.. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2022) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/4/2022. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2022) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/21/2022) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Brian Whitaker re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/21/2022) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Taste, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17009676.). Filed byBrian Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/21/2022) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan V. Okelberry(Designation Retained)