This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2021 at 10:50:25 (UTC).

Whitaker v. San Francisco CDC LLC

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Whitaker filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against San Francisco CDC LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kandis A. Westmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02616

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kandis A. Westmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Whitaker

Defendant

San Francisco CDC LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Prathima Reddy Price

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorney

Jan Nicholas Marfori

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

400 South Hope Street, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT re #1 Complaint filed by San Francisco CDC LLC and Brian Whitaker. (Marfori, Jan) (Filed on 5/13/2021) Modified on 5/14/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Whitaker. San Francisco CDC LLC served on 5/6/2021, answer due 5/27/2021. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/6/2021) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brian Whitaker.. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/15/2021) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2021) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to San Francisco CDC LLC. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2021) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/26/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/12/2021) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Brian Whitaker re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/12/2021) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15822850.). Filed byBrian Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/12/2021) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.F. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jan Nicholas Marfori