Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/03/2021 at 08:11:42 (UTC).

Whitaker v. Navistar Inc

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 Whitaker filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Navistar Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen P. Friot. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00074

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen P. Friot

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Whitaker

Defendant

Navistar Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeff Cheap

Attorney at Lemon Law Group Partners PLLC

3323 Ne 163Rd St, Ste 504

North Miami Beach, FL 33160

Defendant Attorneys

Justin G Bates

Attorney at Phillips Murrah PC-101-OKC

101 N Robinson Ave, 13Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Rodney L Cook

Attorney at Phillips Murrah PC-101-OKC

101 N Robinson Ave, 13Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER re #12 3/3/2021 Order. The court sua sponte GRANTS plf's counsel until 4/30/2021 to obtain admission to the bar of this court, to register for ECF, & to enter his appearance in this case. Failure to do so shall result in plf's counsel being deemed withdrawn as counsel for plf. Plf shall then be required to secure an entry of appearance by new counsel or enter an appearance pro se by 5/7/2021, the failure of which shall result in dismissal of plf's action w/o prejudice. The court also sua sponte EXTENDS the ddl for plf to respond to #7 Defendant Navistar, Inc.'s Amended Partial Motion to Dismiss with Brief in Support until 5/7/2021. Dft shall have 14 days from the date of the filing of plf's response to file any reply. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 3/31/2021. (llg) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER re #10 2/17/2021 Order. The court sua sponte GRANTS plf's counsel until 3/31/2021 to obtain admission to the bar of this court, to register for ECF, & to enter his appearance in this case. Failure to do so shall result in plf's counsel being deemed withdrawn as counsel for plf. Plf shall then be required to secure an entry of appearance by new counsel or enter an appearance pro se by 4/7/2021, the failure of which shall result in dismissal of plf's action w/o prejudice. The court also sua sponte EXTENDS the ddl for plf to respond to #7 Defendant Navistar, Inc.'s Amended Partial Motion to Dismiss with Brief in Support until 4/7/2021. Dft shall have 14 days from the date of the filing of plf's response to file any reply. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 3/3/2021. (llg) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#11

(#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Rodney L Cook on behalf of Navistar Inc (Cook, Rodney) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER re #6 2/3/2021 Order. The court sua sponte GRANTS plf's counsel until 3/3/2021 to seek & obtain admission to practice in this district, to register for ECF, & to enter his appearance. Failure to do so shall result in plf's counsel being deemed withdrawn as counsel. Plf shall then be required to secure an entry of appearance by new counsel or enter an appearance pro se by 3/10/2021, the failure of which shall result dismissal of plf's action w/o prejudice. The court also sua sponte EXTENDS the deadline for plf to respond to #7 Defendant Navistar, Inc.'s Amended Partial Motion to Dismiss with Brief in Support until 3/10/2021. Dft shall have 14 days from the date of the filing of plf's response to file any reply. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/17/2021. (llg) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#9

(#9) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Navistar Inc. (Bates, Justin) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#7

(#7) AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss with Brief in Support by Navistar Inc. (Bates, Justin) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER. Plf's counsel, Jeff Cheap is granted until 2/17/2021 to show association with local counsel as required by LCvR83.3(a). Local counsel, in accordance with LCvR83.3(b) & LCvR83.2(g), shall also file a motion for Mr. Cheap to be admitted pro hac vice. After Mr. Cheap has been admitted pro hac vice, he must immediately register for ECF & file his entry of appearance. If Mr. Cheap fails to show association with local counsel by 2/17/2021, he shall be deemed withdrawn as counsel for plf. Plf shall then be required to secure an entry of appearance by new counsel or enter an appearance pro se by 3/3/2021. Plf is advised that failure to secure the entry of appearance by new counsel or to enter an appearance pro se by 3/3/2021 may result in the dismissal of plf's action w/o prejudice. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/3/2021. (llg) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Navistar Inc. (Bates, Justin) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Navistar Inc re #1 Notice of Removal (Bates, Justin) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Navistar Inc . (Bates, Justin) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Justin G Bates on behalf of Navistar Inc (Bates, Justin) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3- Docket Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2- Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit 1- Summons

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-6158 filed by Navistar Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Summons, #2 Exhibit 2- Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3- Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER re #12 3/3/2021 Order. The court sua sponte GRANTS plf's counsel until 4/30/2021 to obtain admission to the bar of this court, to register for ECF, & to enter his appearance in this case. Failure to do so shall result in plf's counsel being deemed withdrawn as counsel for plf. Plf shall then be required to secure an entry of appearance by new counsel or enter an appearance pro se by 5/7/2021, the failure of which shall result in dismissal of plf's action w/o prejudice. The court also sua sponte EXTENDS the ddl for plf to respond to #7 Defendant Navistar, Inc.'s Amended Partial Motion to Dismiss with Brief in Support until 5/7/2021. Dft shall have 14 days from the date of the filing of plf's response to file any reply. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 3/31/2021. (llg) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER re #10 2/17/2021 Order. The court sua sponte GRANTS plf's counsel until 3/31/2021 to obtain admission to the bar of this court, to register for ECF, & to enter his appearance in this case. Failure to do so shall result in plf's counsel being deemed withdrawn as counsel for plf. Plf shall then be required to secure an entry of appearance by new counsel or enter an appearance pro se by 4/7/2021, the failure of which shall result in dismissal of plf's action w/o prejudice. The court also sua sponte EXTENDS the ddl for plf to respond to #7 Defendant Navistar, Inc.'s Amended Partial Motion to Dismiss with Brief in Support until 4/7/2021. Dft shall have 14 days from the date of the filing of plf's response to file any reply. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 3/3/2021. (llg) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Rodney L Cook on behalf of Navistar Inc (Cook, Rodney) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER re #6 2/3/2021 Order. The court sua sponte GRANTS plf's counsel until 3/3/2021 to seek & obtain admission to practice in this district, to register for ECF, & to enter his appearance. Failure to do so shall result in plf's counsel being deemed withdrawn as counsel. Plf shall then be required to secure an entry of appearance by new counsel or enter an appearance pro se by 3/10/2021, the failure of which shall result dismissal of plf's action w/o prejudice. The court also sua sponte EXTENDS the deadline for plf to respond to #7 Defendant Navistar, Inc.'s Amended Partial Motion to Dismiss with Brief in Support until 3/10/2021. Dft shall have 14 days from the date of the filing of plf's response to file any reply. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/17/2021. (llg) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Navistar Inc. (Bates, Justin) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) (TEXT ONLY) ORDER. In light of the filing of #7 Defendant's Amended Partial Motion to Dismiss With Brief in Support, the court STRIKES AS MOOT #5 Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss. Entered at the direction of Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/3/2021. (llg) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss with Brief in Support by Navistar Inc. (Bates, Justin) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER. Plf's counsel, Jeff Cheap is granted until 2/17/2021 to show association with local counsel as required by LCvR83.3(a). Local counsel, in accordance with LCvR83.3(b) & LCvR83.2(g), shall also file a motion for Mr. Cheap to be admitted pro hac vice. After Mr. Cheap has been admitted pro hac vice, he must immediately register for ECF & file his entry of appearance. If Mr. Cheap fails to show association with local counsel by 2/17/2021, he shall be deemed withdrawn as counsel for plf. Plf shall then be required to secure an entry of appearance by new counsel or enter an appearance pro se by 3/3/2021. Plf is advised that failure to secure the entry of appearance by new counsel or to enter an appearance pro se by 3/3/2021 may result in the dismissal of plf's action w/o prejudice. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/3/2021. (llg) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Navistar Inc. (Bates, Justin) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Navistar Inc re #1 Notice of Removal (Bates, Justin) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Navistar Inc . (Bates, Justin) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Justin G Bates on behalf of Navistar Inc (Bates, Justin) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3575965. (Bates, Justin) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-6158 filed by Navistar Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Summons, #2 Exhibit 2- Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3- Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Navistar, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rodney Lynn Cook

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin G. Bates