This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/01/2021 at 09:19:17 (UTC).

Whitaker v. Macy's, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Whitaker filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Macy's, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia K. DeMarchi and Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01474

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Virginia K. DeMarchi

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Whitaker

Defendant

Macy's, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Prathima Reddy Price

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorneys

Danielle Elizabeth Vallone

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

One Market Plaza, Spear Tower, Suite 3900

San Francisco, CA 94105

Stephanie Anne Sheridan, Esq.

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

One Market Plaza, Spear Tower, Suite 3900

San Francisco, CA 94105-1409

 

Court Documents

#1

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#10

7 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Elizabeth Vallone on Behalf of Defendant Macy's, Inc. (Vallone, Danielle) (Filed on 3/29/2021) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Certificate of Interested Entities by Macy's, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Macy's, Inc., Other Affiliate Blackrock, Inc., Other Affiliate Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC for Macy's, Inc.. (Sheridan, Stephanie) (Filed on 3/29/2021) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint byMacy's, Inc.. (Sheridan, Stephanie) (Filed on 3/29/2021) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Anne Sheridan, Esq On Behalf of Defendant Macy's, Inc. (Sheridan, Stephanie) (Filed on 3/29/2021) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Whitaker. Macy's, Inc. served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/19/2021) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Case REASSIGNED to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#9) This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brian Whitaker.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/3/2021) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Macy's, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/16/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/2/2021) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Brian Whitaker re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/2/2021) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15640080.). Filed byBrian Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 3/2/2021) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MACY'S is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie Sheridan