This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2021 at 07:10:47 (UTC).

Whitaker v. Honeybee Foods Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 Whitaker filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Honeybee Foods Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia K. DeMarchi and Lucy H. Koh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-06361

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Virginia K. DeMarchi

Presiding Judge

Lucy H. Koh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Whitaker

Defendant

Honeybee Foods Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Prathima Reddy Price

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorney

Martin Sai-Jun Li

Attorney at Atkinson Andelson Loya Ruud and Romo

12800 Center Court Drive South, Suite 300

Cerritos, CA 90703

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by Honeybee Foods Corporation and Brian Whitaker. (Li, Martin) (Filed on 10/13/2021) Modified on 10/14/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Honeybee Foods Corporation and Brian Whitaker. (Li, Martin) (Filed on 9/15/2021) Modified on 9/16/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Whitaker. Honeybee Foods Corporation served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 9/8/2021) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

9 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#9

(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk CLERK on 8/223/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2021) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brian Whitaker.. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 8/20/2021) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Honeybee Foods Corporation. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2021) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2021) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 8/18/2021) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Brian Whitaker re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 8/18/2021) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16294908.). Filed byBrian Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 8/18/2021) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by Honeybee Foods Corporation and Brian Whitaker. (Li, Martin) (Filed on 10/13/2021) Modified on 10/14/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Honeybee Foods Corporation and Brian Whitaker. (Li, Martin) (Filed on 9/15/2021) Modified on 9/16/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Whitaker. Honeybee Foods Corporation served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 9/8/2021) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk CLERK on 8/223/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2021) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2021) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brian Whitaker.. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 8/20/2021) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Honeybee Foods Corporation. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2021) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2021) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/1/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2021) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 8/18/2021) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Brian Whitaker re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 8/18/2021) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16294908.). Filed byBrian Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 8/18/2021) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HONEYBEE FOODS CORPORATION is a litigant