This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/25/2021 at 07:51:35 (UTC).

Whitaker v. EnSite USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 Whitaker filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against EnSite USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02808

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joe Whitaker

Defendant

EnSite USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard J Burch

Attorney at Bruckner Burch PLLC

11 Greenway Plaza, Ste 3025

Houston, TX 77046

Frank J. Mazzaferro

Attorney at Fitapelli & Shaffer, LLP

28 Liberty St, 30Th Fl

New York, NY 10005

Joseph A. Fitapelli

Attorney at Fitapelli & Schaffer

28 Liberty Street, 30Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Defendant Attorney

Marlene C Williams

Attorney at Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP

1001 Fannin, Ste. 3700

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Tolling Agreement

#2

#3

3 #1

Affidavit

#4

4 #1

Affidavit

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Exhibit A - Motion to Consolidate

#9

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by EnSite USA, Inc., filed.(Williams, Marlene) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate by EnSite USA, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Consolidate)(Williams, Marlene) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by EnSite USA, Inc., filed.(Williams, Marlene) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Joseph A. Fitapelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Frank J. Mazzaferro to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph A. Fitapelli , filed. Motion Docket Date 10/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Fitapelli, Joseph) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Frank J. Mazzaferro, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Mazzaferro, Frank) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to EnSite USA, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(BrendaLacy, 4) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/5/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against EnSite USA, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26958537) filed by Joe Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tolling Agreement)(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EnSite USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marlene C. Williams