This case was last updated from PACER on 04/23/2021 at 07:55:19 (UTC).

Whipple v. Aon Risk Services Companies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 Whipple filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Aon Risk Services Companies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01262

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Derek Whipple

Defendants

Aon Risk Services Companies, Inc.

Aon PLC

Aon Group, Inc.

Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Seth M. Gerber

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Debra L. Fischer

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Andrew Romeo

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

18565 Jamboree Road, Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92612

Derek S. Hecht

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

18565 Jamboree Road, Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

23 #2

Exhibit B

23 #1

Exhibit A

#23

(#23) Request for Judicial Notice re #22 Reply to Opposition/Response, Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration filed byAon Group, Inc., Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc., Aon Risk Services Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #22 ) (Romeo, Mark) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

22 #1

Declaration (Supplemental Declaration of Paul James Gloriod, Jr. in Support of D

#22

(#22) REPLY (re #8 MOTION to Compel ) Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed byAon Group, Inc., Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc., Aon Risk Services Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Supplemental Declaration of Paul James Gloriod, Jr. in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration))(Romeo, Mark) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#21

(#21) REPLY (re #12 MOTION to Remand ) Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion to Remand filed byDerek Whipple. (Gerber, Seth) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

12 #2

Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Rem

12 #1

Declaration Declaration of Derek Whipple ISO Plaintiff's Motion to Remand

#12

Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Compel , #12 MOTION to Remand. Responses due by 4/15/2021. Replies due by 4/22/2021. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aon Group, Inc., Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc., Aon Risk Services Companies, Inc... (Romeo, Mark) (Filed on 3/4/2021) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#5

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aon Group, Inc., Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc., Aon Risk Services Companies, Inc. re #3 Amended Notice of Removal, #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines served on February 24, 2021 (Romeo, Mark) (Filed on 3/4/2021) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

3 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aon Group, Inc., Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc., Aon Risk Services Companies, Inc. re #3 Amended Notice of Removal, #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines served on February 24, 2021 (Romeo, Mark) (Filed on 3/4/2021) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aon Group, Inc., Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc., Aon Risk Services Companies, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Romeo, Mark) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aon Group, Inc., Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc., Aon Risk Services Companies, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Romeo, Mark) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Request for Judicial Notice re #22 Reply to Opposition/Response, Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration filed byAon Group, Inc., Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc., Aon Risk Services Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #22 ) (Romeo, Mark) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REPLY (re #8 MOTION to Compel ) Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed byAon Group, Inc., Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc., Aon Risk Services Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Supplemental Declaration of Paul James Gloriod, Jr. in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration))(Romeo, Mark) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY (re #12 MOTION to Remand ) Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion to Remand filed byDerek Whipple. (Gerber, Seth) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Remand ) filed byAon Group, Inc., Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc., Aon Risk Services Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul James Gloriod, Jr. in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Romeo, Mark) (Filed on 4/15/2021) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance for Aon Risk Services Companies, Inc., Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc., and Aon Group, Inc. by Derek S. Hecht (Hecht, Derek) (Filed on 3/25/2021) Modified on 3/26/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Compel , #12 MOTION to Remand. Responses due by 4/15/2021. Replies due by 4/22/2021. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #17 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re: Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Motion to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Remand.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Motion to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Remand filed by Derek Whipple, Aon Risk Services, Inc., Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc., and Aon Group, Inc.. (Gerber, Seth) (Filed on 3/23/2021) Modified on 3/24/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DECLARATION of Derek Whipple in Opposition to #14 Opposition/Response to Motion Declaration of Derek Whipple in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration filed byDerek Whipple. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Gerber, Seth) (Filed on 3/18/2021) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DECLARATION of Seth M. Gerber in Opposition to #14 Opposition/Response to Motion Declaration of Seth M. Gerber in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration filed byDerek Whipple. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Gerber, Seth) (Filed on 3/18/2021) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 3/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Compel filed by Aon Group, Inc., Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc., Aon Risk Services Companies, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2021 01:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 3/18/2021. Replies due by 3/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark A. Romeo in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Declaration of Paul James Gloriod, Jr., in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration, #3 Proposed Order)(Romeo, Mark) (Filed on 3/4/2021) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aon Group, Inc., Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc., Aon Risk Services Companies, Inc. re #3 Amended Notice of Removal, #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines served on February 24, 2021 (Romeo, Mark) (Filed on 3/4/2021) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aon Group, Inc., Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc., Aon Risk Services Companies, Inc... (Romeo, Mark) (Filed on 3/4/2021) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/9/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action to Federal Court against Derek Whipple. Filed byAon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc., Aon Risk Services Companies, Inc., Aon Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Romeo, Mark) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aon Group, Inc., Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc., Aon Risk Services Companies, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Romeo, Mark) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action to Federal Court from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-21-588920. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15604830). Filed byAon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc., Aon Risk Services Companies, Inc., Aon Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Romeo, Mark) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aon Group Inc, a Maryland Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Aon Risk Services Central, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AON is a litigant

Latest cases where AON RISK INSURANCE SERVICES WEST INC. is a litigant