Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/28/2021 at 08:23:08 (UTC).

Wheeler v. Medical Device Business Services Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 Wheeler filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Medical Device Business Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ed Kinkeade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00181

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ed Kinkeade

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daryl Wheeler

Defendants

DePuy Products Inc

Johnson & Johnson Services Inc

DePuy International Limited

Medical Device Business Services Inc

Johnson & Johnson

Special Master

Special Master

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donald E Smolen

Attorney at Smolen Law PLLC

611 S Detroit Avenue

Tulsa, OK 74120

Laura Lauth Hamilton

Attorney at Smolen Law PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Donald E Smolen, II

Attorney at Smolen Law PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Defendant Attorneys

Terri Bruksch

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg

11 S Meridian St

Indianapolis, IN 45204

Amy Sherry-Fischer

Attorney at Foliart Huff Ottaway & Bottom

201 Robert S Kerr Avenue, 12Th Floor

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Jessica D Miller

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

1440 New York Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Michael V Powell

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201-6776

Special Master Attorney

James M Stanton-2244

Attorney at Stanton LLP

1717 Main Street, Suite 3800

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#2

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Products, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura Lauth Hamilton on behalf of Daryl Wheeler. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hamilton, Laura) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Donald E Smolen, II on behalf of Daryl Wheeler. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

25 #1

*Restricted*

#25

(#25) Case electronically transferred in from District of Oklahoma Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00666. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#24

(#24) ORDER by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the MDL Panel, transferring case (terminates case) (ll, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#23

(#23) ***Remark: Received Minute Order from MDL re: transferee clerk to transmit a certified copy of the Panel Order to transfer to the district court from which the action is being transferred. (ll, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#22

(#22) ***Remark: Received Conditional Transfer Order from MDL re: stay is lifted (ll, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Party Name Correction by DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#17

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Products, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: DePuy Products, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Daryl Wheeler (Smolen, Donald) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/31/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Daryl Wheeler (Smolen, Donald) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/31/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (sc, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#3

NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: document filed to this case in error; Correction: marked entry as entered in error; refiled in correct case (Re: #3 Clerk's Notice of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge (Social Security), ) (ll, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/17/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura Lauth Hamilton on behalf of Daryl Wheeler. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hamilton, Laura) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Donald E Smolen, II on behalf of Daryl Wheeler. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Case electronically transferred in from District of Oklahoma Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00666. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #24 ) (sac, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the MDL Panel, transferring case (terminates case) (ll, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ***Remark: Received Minute Order from MDL re: transferee clerk to transmit a certified copy of the Panel Order to transfer to the district court from which the action is being transferred. (ll, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ***Remark: Received Conditional Transfer Order from MDL re: stay is lifted (ll, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Johnson & Johnson, Inc. be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #18 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (ll, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #19 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Party Name Correction by DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Products, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amy Sherry-Fischer on behalf of DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Products, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. [Note: Attorney Amy Sherry-Fischer added to party DePuy International Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Sherry-Fischer added to party DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Sherry-Fischer added to party DePuy Products, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Sherry-Fischer added to party Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Sherry-Fischer added to party Johnson & Johnson, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: DePuy Products, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Daryl Wheeler (Smolen, Donald) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Daryl Wheeler (Smolen, Donald) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Daryl Wheeler (Smolen, Donald) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (sc, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: document filed to this case in error; Correction: marked entry as entered in error; refiled in correct case (Re: #3 Clerk's Notice of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge (Social Security), ) (ll, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Court Clerk of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge [includes the following attachments: (1) a Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form, and (2) a copy of General Order 16-08] (ll, Dpty Clk) Modified on 12/17/2020 - ENTERED IN ERROR - Filed to this case in error (ll, Dpty Clk). [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Depuy Products, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2321611) by Daryl Wheeler (Smolen, Donald) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Daryl Wheeler (Smolen, Donald) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 1/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DePuy International Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where DePuy Products Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where DePuy Orthopaedics Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant