This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 07:49:34 (UTC).

Wheeler v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability case was filed by Wheeler against Johnson Johnson in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-17166

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christina R Wheeler

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christina R Wheeler. JOHNSON & JOHNSON waiver sent on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC waiver sent on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#6

(#6) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (dm ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC with JURY DEMAND, filed by Christina R Wheeler.(GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

3 #1

*Restricted*

#3

(#3) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 6:19-cv-06580. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#2

(#2) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by Clerk of the Panel on 8/21/19. (TF) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3545987, filed by Christina R Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldstein, Brian) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christina R Wheeler. JOHNSON & JOHNSON waiver sent on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC waiver sent on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (dm ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC with JURY DEMAND, filed by Christina R Wheeler.(GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jdb) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 6:19-cv-06580. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by Clerk of the Panel on 8/21/19. (TF) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action emailed to the MDL. Summonses not issued, plaintiff mailed defendants notice and waivers (TF) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(TF) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael A. Telesca. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3545987, filed by Christina R Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldstein, Brian) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.