This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2022 at 07:52:10 (UTC).

Wheeler v. Danella Rail Services Corp.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2022 Wheeler filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Danella Rail Services Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wendy W. Berger and Gregory J. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00216

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wendy W. Berger

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alex Wheeler

Defendant

Danella Rail Services Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter Michael Hoogerwoerd

Attorney at Remer & Georges-Pierre

44 West Flagler Street, Suite 2200

Miami, FL 33130

Corey Logan Seldin

Attorney at Remer and Georges-Pierre PLLC

44 W Flagler St., Suite #2200

Miami, FL 33130

Cristobal Bobadilla-Gamboa

Suite 2200, 151 Southeast 1St Street

Miami, FL 32832

Defendant Attorneys

Ashleigh Singleton

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

101 N. Monroe Street, Suite 925

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Dena H. Sokolow

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P. C.

3301 Thomasville Road, Suite 201

Tallahassee, FL 32308

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/13/2022 Joinder of Parties due by 5/13/2022 Discovery due by 2/3/2023 Dispositive motions due by 3/7/2023 Pretrial statement due by 7/10/2023 All other motions due by 6/7/2023 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/6/2022 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/5/2023 Trial Status Conference set for 7/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 8/7/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Conduct mediation hearing by 2/17/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/14/2022. (RMF)ctp (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#12

(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Singleton, Ashleigh) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Alex Wheeler. (Seldin, Corey) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Corey Logan Seldin on behalf of Alex Wheeler. Lead Counsel: Peter M. Hoogerwoerd, Esq.. (Seldin, Corey) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Danella Rail Services Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Danella Companies, Inc. for Danella Rail Services Corp... (Sokolow, Dena) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#8

(#8) Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Danella Rail Services Corp..(Sokolow, Dena) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Ashleigh Singleton on behalf of Danella Rail Services Corp. (Singleton, Ashleigh) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER Standing Discovery Order Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 2/3/2022. (MB) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

1 #14

Exhibit J - NOF Notice of Removal

1 #12

Exhibit H - Separation Form

1 #10

Exhibit F - 2021 Foreign Profit

1 #9

Exhibit E - DE Div of Corp

1 #8

Exhibit D - DL

1 #7

Exhibit C - Employment Application

1 #6

State Court Docket Sheet B5 - State Court Docket

1 #5

State Court Other Documents B4 - Other State Court Documents

1 #3

Proposed Summons B2 - State Summons to be Issued

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet A - Federal Civil Cover Sheet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • Docket(#14) CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Mediator: Carlos Burruezo (KNC) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/13/2022 Joinder of Parties due by 5/13/2022 Discovery due by 2/3/2023 Dispositive motions due by 3/7/2023 Pretrial statement due by 7/10/2023 All other motions due by 6/7/2023 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/6/2022 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/5/2023 Trial Status Conference set for 7/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 8/7/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Conduct mediation hearing by 2/17/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/14/2022. (RMF)ctp (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Singleton, Ashleigh) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Alex Wheeler. (Seldin, Corey) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Corey Logan Seldin on behalf of Alex Wheeler. Lead Counsel: Peter M. Hoogerwoerd, Esq.. (Seldin, Corey) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Danella Rail Services Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Danella Companies, Inc. for Danella Rail Services Corp... (Sokolow, Dena) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Danella Rail Services Corp..(Sokolow, Dena) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ALL) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 2/7/2022. (ALL) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Ashleigh Singleton on behalf of Danella Rail Services Corp. (Singleton, Ashleigh) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to counsel Cristobal Bobadilla-Gamboa of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Standing Discovery Order Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 2/3/2022. (MB) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:22-cv-0216-WWB-GJK. (SJB) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court, 18th Judicial Circuit, Brevard County, FL, case number 05-2021-CA-056789 filed in State Court on December 17, 2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19188553 filed by Danella Rail Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet A - Federal Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet B1 - State Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons B2 - State Summons to be Issued, #4 State Court COMPLAINT B3 - State Complaint, #5 State Court Other Documents B4 - Other State Court Documents, #6 State Court Docket Sheet B5 - State Court Docket, #7 Exhibit C - Employment Application, #8 Exhibit D - DL, #9 Exhibit E - DE Div of Corp, #10 Exhibit F - 2021 Foreign Profit, #11 Exhibit G - Earnings, #12 Exhibit H - Separation Form, #13 Exhibit I - Case Management Plan, #14 Exhibit J - NOF Notice of Removal)(Sokolow, Dena) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dena H. Sokolow