This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2020 at 09:24:42 (UTC).

WHEELER v. AMERICAN UNIVERSITY et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 WHEELER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against AMERICAN UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher R. Cooper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02735

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher R. Cooper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GIANNA WHEELER

Defendants

KEVIN BARRETT

DEBORAH SMITH

JOSEPH JOYNER

RICHARD DAVID

AMERICAN UNIVERSITY

STEPHEN KINZER

MICHAEL VENA

JEFFREY BROWN

DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dennis A. Corkery

Attorney at WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS

700 14Th Street, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20005

Margaret Hart

Attorney at WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS

700 14Th Street, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20005

Kaitlin Rose Banner

Attorney at WASH.LAWYERS' CMTE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS & URB.AFFAIRS

700 14Th Street Nw, Ste Fourth Floor

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorney

Paul J. Maloney

Attorney at CARR MALONEY, P.C.

2020 K Street, Nw, Suite 850

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. STEPHEN KINZER served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020 (Corkery, Dennis) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by AMERICAN UNIVERSITY, KEVIN BARRETT, JEFFREY BROWN, JOSEPH JOYNER, MICHAEL VENA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Maloney, Paul) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#5

(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. AMERICAN UNIVERSITY served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; KEVIN BARRETT served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; JEFFREY BROWN served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; JOSEPH JOYNER served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; MICHAEL VENA served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020 (Corkery, Dennis) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Hart on behalf of GIANNA WHEELER (Hart, Margaret) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A. Corkery on behalf of GIANNA WHEELER (Corkery, Dennis) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

2 #1

Notice and Consent

#2

(#2) SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to AMERICAN UNIVERSITY, KEVIN BARRETT, JEFFREY BROWN, RICHARD DAVID, JOSEPH JOYNER, STEPHEN KINZER, DEBORAH SMITH, MICHAEL VENA. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

1 #10

Summons

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Addendum to Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BDCDC-7637779) filed by GIANNA WHEELER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Addendum to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Banner, Kaitlin) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. STEPHEN KINZER served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020 (Corkery, Dennis) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before December 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/17/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by AMERICAN UNIVERSITY, KEVIN BARRETT, JEFFREY BROWN, JOSEPH JOYNER, MICHAEL VENA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Maloney, Paul) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. AMERICAN UNIVERSITY served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; KEVIN BARRETT served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; JEFFREY BROWN served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; JOSEPH JOYNER served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; MICHAEL VENA served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020 (Corkery, Dennis) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Hart on behalf of GIANNA WHEELER (Hart, Margaret) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A. Corkery on behalf of GIANNA WHEELER (Corkery, Dennis) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to AMERICAN UNIVERSITY, KEVIN BARRETT, JEFFREY BROWN, RICHARD DAVID, JOSEPH JOYNER, STEPHEN KINZER, DEBORAH SMITH, MICHAEL VENA. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmc) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BDCDC-7637779) filed by GIANNA WHEELER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Addendum to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Banner, Kaitlin) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN UNIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis A. Corkery

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kaitlin Rose Banner