This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2019 at 07:55:02 (UTC).

Wheeler, Amanda v. Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 Wheeler, Amanda filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00016

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Amanda Wheeler

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC

Daryl Oestreich

Gurstel Law Firm, P.C.

Lawgistic Partners, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Matthew Curtiss Lein

Attorney at Lein Law Offices

15692 Us Hwy. 63, P.O. Box 761

Hayward, WI 54843

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Charles E Jones

Attorney at Moss & Barnett

150 South Fifth Street, Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jeffrey E. Schelble

Attorney at Gurstel Law Firm PC

6681 Country Club Dr

Golden Valley, MN 55427

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey E. Schelble for Counter Claimant Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC. (Schelble, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/8/2019. (lak) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#11

(#11) Amended ANSWER by Defendants Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC, Lawgistic Partners, LLC, Gurstel Law Firm P.C. and Daryl Oestreich, COUNTERCLAIM against Amanda Wheeler by Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC. (Jones, Charles) Modified on 3/4/2019. (lak) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#10

(#10) Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lein, Matthew) Modified on 2/22/2019. (lak) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER by Defendants Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC, Gurstel Law Firm, P.C., Lawgistic Partners, LLC, Daryl Oestreich. (Jones, Charles) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer by Plaintiff Amanda Wheeler, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lein, Matthew) Modified on 2/5/2019. (lak) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#5

(#5) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Gurstel Law Firm, P.C. served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (Lein, Matthew) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#4

(#4) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (Lein, Matthew) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#3

(#3) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Lawgistic Partners, LLC served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Lein, Matthew) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC, Gurstel Law Firm, P.C., Lawgistic Partners, LLC, Daryl Oestreich. (jat) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

1 #6

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Summons - Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC

1 #3

Summons - Gurstel Law Firm, PC

1 #2

Summons - Lawgistic Partners, LLC

1 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service filed in State Court as to Daryl Oestreich

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2388234.), filed by Amanda Wheeler, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service filed in State Court as to Daryl Oestreich, #2 Summons - Lawgistic Partners, LLC, #3 Summons - Gurstel Law Firm, PC, #4 Summons - Daryl Oestreich, #5 Summons - Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC, #6 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lein, Matthew) Modified on 1/8/2019. (lak) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey E. Schelble for Counter Claimant Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC. (Schelble, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/8/2019. (lak) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Amended ANSWER by Defendants Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC, Lawgistic Partners, LLC, Gurstel Law Firm P.C. and Daryl Oestreich, COUNTERCLAIM against Amanda Wheeler by Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC. (Jones, Charles) Modified on 3/4/2019. (lak) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lein, Matthew) Modified on 2/22/2019. (lak) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Set Telephone Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jat) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER by Defendants Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC, Gurstel Law Firm, P.C., Lawgistic Partners, LLC, Daryl Oestreich. (Jones, Charles) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Reset Deadlines: Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC answer due 2/11/2019; Gurstel Law Firm, P.C. answer due 2/11/2019; Lawgistic Partners, LLC answer due 2/11/2019. (jat) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting and granting #7 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/5/19. (jat) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer by Plaintiff Amanda Wheeler, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lein, Matthew) Modified on 2/5/2019. (lak) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Charles E. Jones for Defendants Lawgistic Partners LLC, Daryl Oestreich. (Jones, Charles) Modified on 2/1/2019. (lak) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Gurstel Law Firm, P.C. served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (Lein, Matthew) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (Lein, Matthew) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Lawgistic Partners, LLC served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Lein, Matthew) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC, Gurstel Law Firm, P.C., Lawgistic Partners, LLC, Daryl Oestreich. (jat) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2388234.), filed by Amanda Wheeler, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service filed in State Court as to Daryl Oestreich, #2 Summons - Lawgistic Partners, LLC, #3 Summons - Gurstel Law Firm, PC, #4 Summons - Daryl Oestreich, #5 Summons - Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC, #6 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lein, Matthew) Modified on 1/8/2019. (lak) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.