This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:50:58 (UTC).

Wheby v. The KeyW Holding Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Wheby filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against The KeyW Holding Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine C. Blake. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01459

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Catherine C. Blake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Earl M. Wheby, Jr.

Defendants

William I. Campbell

John Inglis

Bill Weber

The KeyW Holding Corporation

Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.

Shephard Hill

Caroline S. Pisano

Deborah A. Bonanni

Mark Sopp

Art Money

Ken Minihan

Atom Acquisition Sub, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas Joseph Minton

Attorney at Goldman and Minton PC

3600 Clipper Mill Rd, Suite 201

Baltimore, MD 21211

 

Court Documents

1 #5

Summons (Weber)

1 #4

Summons (Pisano)

1 #3

Summons (KeyW Holding Corp)

1 #12

Summons (Sopp)

1 #9

Summons (Inglis)

1 #1

Affidavit Plaintiff's Certification

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Earl M. Wheby, Jr (Minton, Thomas) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

1 #8

Summons (Hill)

1 #6

Summons (Bonanni)

1 #14

Summons (Atom Acq. Sub)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8019758.), filed by Earl M. Wheby, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plaintiff's Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons (KeyW Holding Corp), #4 Summons (Pisano), #5 Summons (Weber), #6 Summons (Bonanni), #7 Summons (Campbell), #8 Summons (Hill), #9 Summons (Inglis), #10 Summons (Minihan), #11 Summons (Money), #12 Summons (Sopp), #13 Summons (Jacobs Eng. Grp.), #14 Summons (Atom Acq. Sub))(Minton, Thomas) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Atom Acquisition Sub, Inc., Deborah A. Bonanni, William I. Campbell, Shephard Hill, John Inglis, Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc., Ken Minihan, Art Money, Caroline S. Pisano, Mark Sopp, The KeyW Holding Corporation, Bill Weber.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

1 #11

Summons (Money)

1 #7

Summons (Campbell)

1 #13

Summons (Jacobs Eng. Grp.)

#4

(#4) MARGINAL ORDER Approving #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Earl M. Wheby, Jr.. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 6/6/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MARGINAL ORDER Approving #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Earl M. Wheby, Jr.. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 6/6/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Earl M. Wheby, Jr (Minton, Thomas) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Atom Acquisition Sub, Inc., Deborah A. Bonanni, William I. Campbell, Shephard Hill, John Inglis, Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc., Ken Minihan, Art Money, Caroline S. Pisano, Mark Sopp, The KeyW Holding Corporation, Bill Weber.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8019758.), filed by Earl M. Wheby, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plaintiff's Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons (KeyW Holding Corp), #4 Summons (Pisano), #5 Summons (Weber), #6 Summons (Bonanni), #7 Summons (Campbell), #8 Summons (Hill), #9 Summons (Inglis), #10 Summons (Minihan), #11 Summons (Money), #12 Summons (Sopp), #13 Summons (Jacobs Eng. Grp.), #14 Summons (Atom Acq. Sub))(Minton, Thomas) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.