This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2019 at 05:38:45 (UTC).

Matthew Wheatley v. Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/21/2019 Matthew Wheatley filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Pym and Jesus G. Bernal. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00513

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew Wheatley

Defendants

Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc.

DOES 1 through 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melissa A LeBlanc

Edwin Aiwazian

Defendant Attorneys

David Samuel Rosenberg

Jonathan D Meer

Timothy L Hix

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) Receipt of remand letter from San Bernardino Superior Court (twdb) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#28

(#28) TRANSMITTAL of documents to San Bernardino Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to San Bernardino Superior Court. (twdb) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#27

(#27) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order (1) GRANTING Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (Dkt. No. #19 ); (2) DENYING as MOOT Defendants Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Dkt. No. #17 ); and (3) VACATING the June 10, 2019 Hearing. Case Remanded to San Bernardino Superior Court CIVDS 1820484. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

19 #2

Proposed Order

19 #1

Declaration of Melissa LeBlanc In Support of Motion to Remand

#19

(#22) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court #19 filed by Defendant Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc.. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

17 #3

Proposed Order

17 #2

Declaration of David Rosenberg In Support Thereof

17 #1

Memorandum

#17

(#23) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(c) #17 filed by Plaintiff Matthew Wheatley. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Declaration of Melissa LeBlanc In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(LeBlanc, Melissa) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc., re Declaration #7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Related Case(s) #5 , Declaration #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on March 21, 2019. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#7

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc., re Declaration #7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Related Case(s) #5 , Declaration #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on March 21, 2019. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#6

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc., re Declaration #7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Related Case(s) #5 , Declaration #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on March 21, 2019. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#5

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc., re Declaration #7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Related Case(s) #5 , Declaration #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on March 21, 2019. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#4

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc., re Declaration #7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Related Case(s) #5 , Declaration #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on March 21, 2019. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#3

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc., re Declaration #7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Related Case(s) #5 , Declaration #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on March 21, 2019. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#2

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc., re Declaration #7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Related Case(s) #5 , Declaration #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on March 21, 2019. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#1

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc., re Declaration #7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Related Case(s) #5 , Declaration #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on March 21, 2019. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/21/2019
View Court Documents

(#29) Receipt of remand letter from San Bernardino Superior Court (twdb) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2019
View Court Documents

(#28) TRANSMITTAL of documents to San Bernardino Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to San Bernardino Superior Court. (twdb) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2019
View Court Documents

(#27) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order (1) GRANTING Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (Dkt. No. #19 ); (2) DENYING as MOOT Defendants Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Dkt. No. #17 ); and (3) VACATING the June 10, 2019 Hearing. Case Remanded to San Bernardino Superior Court CIVDS 1820484. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2019
View Court Documents

(#26) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(c) #17 SUPPLEMENTAL filed by Defendant Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H thru L In Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit M thru W In Support Thereof)(Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2019
View Court Documents

(#25) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(c) #17 filed by Defendant Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc.. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2019
View Court Documents

(#24) REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court #19 filed by Plaintiff Matthew Wheatley. (LeBlanc, Melissa) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2019
View Court Documents

(#23) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(c) #17 filed by Plaintiff Matthew Wheatley. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Declaration of Melissa LeBlanc In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(LeBlanc, Melissa) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2019
View Court Documents

(#22) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court #19 filed by Defendant Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc.. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2019
View Court Documents

(#21) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (iva) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2019
View Court Documents

(#20) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
03/21/2019

CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/2/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO THE DECLARATION of David Rosenberg EXHIBIT B)(ghap) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2019

CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Matthew Wheatley. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/7/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO THE DECLARATION of David Rosenberg EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2019
View Court Documents

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc., re Declaration #7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Related Case(s) #5 , Declaration #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on March 21, 2019. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2019
View Court Documents

(#7) DECLARATION of David Rosenberg re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc.. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2019
View Court Documents

(#6) DECLARATION of Chase Thornburgh re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc.. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2019
View Court Documents

(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc.. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2019
View Court Documents

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2019
View Court Documents

(#3) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc., identifying 1. Plaintiff Matthew Wheatley 2. Masterbrand Cabnets, Inc.. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2019
View Court Documents

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc.. (Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2019
View Court Documents

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of San Bernardino, case number CIVDS1820484 Receipt No: 0973-23417852 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc.. (Attorney David Samuel Rosenberg added to party Masterbrand Cabinets, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rosenberg, David) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less