This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2021 at 07:18:46 (UTC).

WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert M. Dow, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00320

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert M. Dow, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O

WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD.

Defendant

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Grodman

Attorney at Jiangip Llc

111 West Jackson Blvd, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

Yanling Jiang

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

111 West Jackson Boulevard, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

Keith A. Vogt

Attorney at Keith Vogt, Ltd.

111 West Jackson Boulevard, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

Yi Bu

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

111 West Jackson Boulevard, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Depeng Bi

Attorney at The Law Offices Of Konrad Sherinian, Llc

1755 Park Street, Suite 200

Naperville, IL 60563

Frank Gao

Attorney at ABC Patent Service, LLC

1261 21St Street

Wilmette, IL 60091

Shengmao Mu

Attorney at Whitewood Law Pllc

57 West, 57Th Street, 3Rd And 4Th Floors

New York, NY 10019

Konrad Val Sherinian

Attorney at The Law Offices of Konrad Sherinian, LLC

1755 Park Street, Suite 200

Chicago, IL 60563

 

Court Documents

#48

(#48) NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for default judgment #46 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 3/29/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

47 #3

Declaration of Keith A. Vogt

47 #2

Exhibit 2 to Memo in Support

47 #1

Exhibit 1 to Memo in Support

#47

(#47) MEMORANDUM by INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. in support of motion for default judgment #46 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 2 to Memo in Support, #3 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#46

(#46) MOTION by Plaintiffs INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#45

(#45) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#44

(#44) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#43

(#43) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" by Konrad Val Sherinian the defendant store Pasker (Sherinian, Konrad) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#2) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for default judgment #46 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 3/29/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MEMORANDUM by INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. in support of motion for default judgment #46 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 2 to Memo in Support, #3 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MOTION by Plaintiffs INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" by Konrad Val Sherinian the defendant store Pasker (Sherinian, Konrad) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" by Depeng Bi for the store Pasker only (Bi, Depeng) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) STIPULATION of Dismissal As to Defendant Nos. 339 YDDS-1 and 350 Zdgao (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Plaintiffs INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. for leave to file excess pages (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Plaintiffs INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. for leave to file [Certain] Documents Under Seal (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, ) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD., INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17843849. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Grodman