This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2022 at 07:52:12 (UTC).

Wham-O Holding, Ltd. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 Wham-O Holding, Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John Robert Blakey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04980

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Robert Blakey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wham-O Holding, Ltd.

Intersport Corp. doing business as Wham-O

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A

Defendants

Beijing Hui Xin Zhi Xiang Shangmao Youxian Gongsi

Dongguan Jinxiuyunhuadianzishangwuyouxiangongsi

Dongguanshi Shoumo Dianzishangwu Youxiangongsi

Dongguanshi Suqianmei Dianzishangwu Youxiangongsi

Fujianshengminqingtianyijiancaijiajuyouxiangongsi

Guangzhoushi Huangdou Kuajingmaoyi Youxiangongsi

Nan Tong You Hao Wang Luo Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si

Nan Yang Shi Chuang Tuo Shang Mao You Xian Gong Si

Ningbo Huazhirui Electronic Commerce

Sanmenxiashiyiyanshangmaoyouxianzerengongsi

Shandong Huizhiwentong Wangluo Keji Youxian Gongsi

Shenyang Chunhua E-commerce

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Grodman

Attorney at Jiangip Llc

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yanling Jiang

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Ste 200

Chicago, IL 60604

Yi Bu

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Keith A. Vogt

Attorney at Keith Vogt, Ltd.

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#40

(#40) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (cxr, ) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#39

(#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Telephonic motion hearing held on 11/3/2022. Defendant failed to appear and failed to notify Chambers of any scheduling conflicts. Plaintiff's motion for default judgment #29 is granted. Enter Default Judgment Order. Any pending deadlines are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#38

(#38) DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/3/2022. Mailed notice(gel, ) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

#36

(#36) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

#35

(#35) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The 11/3/22 hearing on Plaintiff's motion for default judgment #29 shall proceed via telephone at 11:00 a.m. Counsel and any interested parties shall call 877-402-9753 and utilize participant code 9955840. Members of the public and media may also call in to listen to this hearing using the same credentials. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

#34

(#34) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

#33

(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the filing of the notice of voluntary dismissal #32 , this case is dismissed without prejudice as to defendants Guangzhou Huiyun Trading, Shenyang JiaPengEnBei Jewelry, He Fei Mao An Shang Mao You Xian Gong Si, Hongkong Staroc Technology, Wuhanqingzhiyunjiafangyouxiangongsi, Sanmenxiashiyiyanshangmaoyouxianzerengongsi and Shenzhen Deruisi E-commerce Technology. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#32

(#32) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 10/22/2022)

#29

(#31) NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for default judgment #29 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/3/2022 at 11:00 AM. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (cxr, ) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Telephonic motion hearing held on 11/3/2022. Defendant failed to appear and failed to notify Chambers of any scheduling conflicts. Plaintiff's motion for default judgment #29 is granted. Enter Default Judgment Order. Any pending deadlines are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/3/2022. Mailed notice(gel, ) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Telephonic motion hearing held on 11/3/2022. Defendant failed to appear and failed to notify Chambers of any scheduling conflicts. Plaintiff's motion for default judgment #29 is granted. Enter Default Judgment Order. Any pending deadlines are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice(gel, ) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The 11/3/22 hearing on Plaintiff's motion for default judgment #29 shall proceed via telephone at 11:00 a.m. Counsel and any interested parties shall call 877-402-9753 and utilize participant code 9955840. Members of the public and media may also call in to listen to this hearing using the same credentials. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the filing of the notice of voluntary dismissal #32 , this case is dismissed without prejudice as to defendants Guangzhou Huiyun Trading, Shenyang JiaPengEnBei Jewelry, He Fei Mao An Shang Mao You Xian Gong Si, Hongkong Staroc Technology, Wuhanqingzhiyunjiafangyouxiangongsi, Sanmenxiashiyiyanshangmaoyouxianzerengongsi and Shenzhen Deruisi E-commerce Technology. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 10/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for default judgment #29 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/3/2022 at 11:00 AM. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (cxr, ) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mbh, ) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mbh, ) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. Schedule A to Complaint (1) (Vogt, Keith) Modified on 10/13/2022 (cxr, ). (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Wham-O Holding, Ltd., Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19838228. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Grodman