This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/23/2022 at 09:32:36 (UTC).

Wham-O Holding, Ltd. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 Wham-O Holding, Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Manish S. Shah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02741

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manish S. Shah

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wham-O Holding, Ltd.

Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A

HCPET

dailinga

HoaStoreBest

lamnhung93

lehongsmile

minhluan

phuong237

phuongphuong87

thuphuong123

tunghaiduong89

WWZSHANGMAO

A TREE store

anpingxiankanghe

Arunson

banxiashangdianzi

baohui666

BEEJEE

172 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Grodman

Attorney at Jiangip Llc

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yi Bu

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Keith A. Vogt

Attorney at Keith Vogt, Ltd.

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yanling Jiang

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorney

Jiyuan Zhang

Attorney at J. Zhang And Associates, P.c.

13620 38Th Avenue, Unit 11G

Flushing, NY 11354

Other Attorneys

Yong Chen

Attorney at Liu, Chen & Hoffman Llp

One Penn Plaza, Ste 2508

New York, NY 10119

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Any objections to the motion for entry of default judgment must be properly filed by 7/29/22. If no objections are filed, the motion will be considered unopposed. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

35 #3

Declaration of Keith A. Vogt

35 #2

Exhibit 2

35 #1

Exhibit 1

35 #35

Main Document

#34

(#34) MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

#33

(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time to answer #32 is granted. Defendant ZergStore has until 8/4/22 to respond to the complaint. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#32

(#32) MOTION by Defendant ZergStore for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 UNOPPOSED (Chen, Yong) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#31

(#31) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ZergStore by Yong Chen (Chen, Yong) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Any objections to the motion for entry of default judgment must be properly filed by 7/29/22. If no objections are filed, the motion will be considered unopposed. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MEMORANDUM by Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. in support of motion for default judgment #34 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time to answer #32 is granted. Defendant ZergStore has until 8/4/22 to respond to the complaint. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION by Defendant ZergStore for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 UNOPPOSED (Chen, Yong) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ZergStore by Yong Chen (Chen, Yong) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Taian Detian New Material Co., Ltd., Taizhou Huangyan Teqi Pet Products Factory, Taizhou Intop Industry And Trading Co., Ltd., Taizhou Miko Pet Supplies Co., Ltd., Taocheng District Jiurui Sports Goods Factory, Tianjin Haoqi Baby Trading Co., Ltd., Uniform Times (fujian) International Trade Co., Ltd., Wenzhou Shigao Import And Export Co., Ltd., Wenzhou Siyang Pet Products Co., Ltd., Wuhan Jarmoo Flag Co., Ltd., Xiamen Charmlite Trading Co., Ltd., Xiamen Jalo E-Commerce Technology Co., Ltd., Xiamen Qingzhou Industry And Trade Co., Ltd., Xiamen Sanyuetian Culture Media Co., Ltd., Xiamen Yi'an Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd., Xi'an Newriggy Import And Export Co.,ltd., Yangzhou Lijia Imp. & Exp. Trade Co., Ltd., Yiwu Feishang Household Products Co., Ltd., Yiwu Huajiao Import And Export Co., Ltd., Yiwu Jinlang Sports Goods Co., Ltd., Yiwu Laiwei Trading Co., Ltd., Yiwu Ligo Trading Co., Ltd., Yiwu Lingyu Plastic Products Co., Ltd., Yiwu Saiao Sports Products Co., Ltd., Yiwu Tengbo Sporting Goods Co., Ltd., Yuyao Lingliang Electrical Appliance Co., Ltd., Yuyao Pugga Pet Products Co.,Ltd., Zhejiang Jinfa Industry Co., Ltd., Zhejiang Muqi Import And Export Co., Ltd. and Zhenjiang Huirong Import & Export Co., Ltd. added to case caption. (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Dongguan Visai Industrial Co., Ltd., Dongguan Yichong Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd., Dongguan Yuansheng Electronic Technology Co., Ltd., Dongguan Zhishang Pet Product Co., Ltd., Dongyang Yadi Pet Product Co., Ltd., Foshan Mobipeet Technology Co.,Ltd, Fuzhou Xuance Trade Co., Ltd., Guangdong Vking Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Catdog Pet Products Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Jiacheng Network Technology Co., Ltd., Guizhou Actor Sports Co.,Ltd, Hangzhou Baimi Technology Co., Ltd., Hangzhou Cyrus Technology Co., Ltd., Hangzhou Hachong Pet Products Co., Ltd., Hangzhou Keyuete Imp. Exp. Co., Ltd., Hangzhou Shuhe Household Products Co., Ltd., Hangzhou Xinghongyuan Trading Co., Ltd., Hebei Strue Trading Co., Ltd., Hebei Xixiwei International Trade Co., Ltd., Jiangsu Yrslink Import&Export Co., Ltd., Jiaxing Eternal Trade Co., Ltd., Jinan Liqiang Mould Co., Ltd., Liaocheng Panfeng Trading Co., Ltd., Ningbo Lamb Trading Co., Ltd., NingBo Loky Pet Products Co.,LTD, Ningbo Puda Pet Technology Co., LTD, Ningbo S& L Trading Co., Ltd., Ningbo Ulrich Imp.&exp. Co., Ltd., Ningbo Xiangjia Information Technology Co., Ltd., Pujiang Dog Industry And Trade Co., Ltd., Pujiang Jianyu Sanitary Materials Co., Ltd., Quzhou Joy More Trading Co., Ltd., Shandong Jndo Hoisting Equipment Co., Ltd., Shandong Yibo Pet Products Co., Ltd., Shanghai Fantastic Pet Product Co., Ltd., Shanghai Holly Gifts Co., Ltd., Shanghai Petlot Pet Product Co., Ltd., Shanghai Petlove Industrial Co., Ltd., Shantou Jacko Toys Trading Co., Ltd., Shantou Zhangwu Metal Products Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Baimai Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Jinyang Rubber & Plastic Products Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Kaichuangtong E-Commerce Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Lefuer Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen NSR Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Xixi Pet Products Co.,ltd., Shenzhen Yihongda Electronics Co., Ltd., Sichuan Machinery Imp. & Exp. Corp., Suzhou Shangbaotang Ginseng Antler Co., Ltd. and Suzhou TJT Network Technology Co., Ltd. added to case caption. (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: SXZMRD, Tee Alley, TheGoldenTime, tianruiqibeimei123, ubestsky, wangwang, XiaNingMaoYi, XiaoTianTian, XinYiXun, XinYongHe, xiwang-usa, xuanyu-us, xuebiyuyue, Yahui Zhang, Yangjiande, yaoshun shop, YongSen us, yue lai yue hao, YUGANLIANXINGSHOP, ZergStore, zhihuaxiaodian, 4Homie Store, Bruce Outdoor Supplies Store, Grandma Store, Haomall Life Store, JMshop Store, Joyxeon Life Store, Kitdo Store, Light the World Store, MiMiuLuXiang Toy Store, Mommy's Flavour Mother and Baby Store, Peeiek Store, Petjoy Store, Pets Department Store, RZC Kids Toy Store, Shop1100254081 Store, Shop1100289252 Store, Shop3482063 Store, skylke Store, The Best Option Store, Townson_PetLife Store, Walnut Official Store, Baoji H&S Import and Export Trade Co., Ltd., Changsha Dezhixin Technology Co., Ltd., Changzhou Geerduo Pet Products Co.,ltd., Chengdu Shangke Technology Co., Ltd., Dongguan Avic Industry & Trade Co., Ltd., Dongguan Avic Industry &trade Co., Ltd. and Dongguan Bright Rubber And Plastic Products Co., Ltd. added to case caption. (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for leave to file [Certain] Documents Under Seal (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ey, ) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ey, ) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Wham-O Holding, Ltd., Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19497275. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where INTERSPORT CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA WHAM-O is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yong Chen