This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2022 at 08:21:28 (UTC).

Wham-O Holding, Ltd. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 Wham-O Holding, Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary Feinerman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02571

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary Feinerman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wham-O Holding, Ltd.

Intersport Corp. doing business as Wham-O

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A

Ysiuefos

101, Huide Building, Shenzhen North Railway Station

Gonebin

Woopower

568beach

excurse

Kind-hearted

tolerantlly

yingmande7

tianhaoyury

shuddering

zhengyejie

149 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Grodman

Attorney at Jiangip Llc

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yi Bu

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Keith A. Vogt

Attorney at Keith Vogt, Ltd.

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yanling Jiang

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Charles Edward McElvenny

Attorney at Law Offices of Charles E. McElvenny

33 N Dearborn, Suite 1000

Chicago, IL 60602

Lydia Pittaway

Attorney at Pittaway Law Pllc

133 S 2Nd St Ste 101

Ft. Pierce, FL 34950

Other Attorneys

Eric J Goodman

Attorney at Goodman Mooney, LLP

18012 Cowan, 2Nd Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Gregory P Goonan

Attorney at The Affinity Law Group

5230 Carroll Canyon Road, Suite 230

San Diego, CA 92121

 

Court Documents

#54

(#54) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 7/26/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Motion hearing held. Defendants unopposed motion for extension of time to respond #36 is granted. The deadline for Defendants #1 (568beach), #19 (completeness66), #26 (Ertingbafany), #27 (excurse), #34 (huangjiaxinss), #36 (Ibuywill), #38 (Kaikaistore), #41 (Kind-hearted), #68 (shuddering), #76 (tianhaoyury), #79 (tolerantlly), #85 (Woopower), #94 (yingmande7), and #96 (zhengyejie) to file a responsive pleading is extended to 7/28/2022. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment with the exception of certain Defendants #40 is granted in part (as to a Rule 55(a) entry of default on the remaining Defendants) and entered and continued in part (as to Rule 55(b) default judgment on the remaining Defendants). Enter Rule 55(a) default as to the remaining Defendants. If any Defendant wishes to oppose Plaintiff's Rule 55(b) motion for default judgment, that Defendant must file a written opposition by 7/25/2022 or appear at the 7/26/2022 hearing. If Defendants do not respond or appear, the court will rule on the Rule 55(b) motion at the 7/26/2022 hearing. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 7/26/2022 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#53

(#53) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#52

(#52) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#51

(#51) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19640044. (Goonan, Gregory) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#50

(#50) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#49

(#49) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the Plaintiffs' request, motion for order to show cause #37 and motion to stay and for discovery #38 are withdrawn. The motion hearing set for 7/7/2022 #39 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#40

(#54) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 7/26/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Motion hearing held. Defendants unopposed motion for extension of time to respond #36 is granted. The deadline for Defendants #1 (568beach), #19 (completeness66), #26 (Ertingbafany), #27 (excurse), #34 (huangjiaxinss), #36 (Ibuywill), #38 (Kaikaistore), #41 (Kind-hearted), #68 (shuddering), #76 (tianhaoyury), #79 (tolerantlly), #85 (Woopower), #94 (yingmande7), and #96 (zhengyejie) to file a responsive pleading is extended to 7/28/2022. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment with the exception of certain Defendants #40 is granted in part (as to a Rule 55(a) entry of default on the remaining Defendants) and entered and continued in part (as to Rule 55(b) default judgment on the remaining Defendants). Enter Rule 55(a) default as to the remaining Defendants. If any Defendant wishes to oppose Plaintiff's Rule 55(b) motion for default judgment, that Defendant must file a written opposition by 7/25/2022 or appear at the 7/26/2022 hearing. If Defendants do not respond or appear, the court will rule on the Rule 55(b) motion at the 7/26/2022 hearing. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 7/26/2022 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

37 #1

Exhibit 1

#36

(#54) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 7/26/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Motion hearing held. Defendants unopposed motion for extension of time to respond #36 is granted. The deadline for Defendants #1 (568beach), #19 (completeness66), #26 (Ertingbafany), #27 (excurse), #34 (huangjiaxinss), #36 (Ibuywill), #38 (Kaikaistore), #41 (Kind-hearted), #68 (shuddering), #76 (tianhaoyury), #79 (tolerantlly), #85 (Woopower), #94 (yingmande7), and #96 (zhengyejie) to file a responsive pleading is extended to 7/28/2022. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment with the exception of certain Defendants #40 is granted in part (as to a Rule 55(a) entry of default on the remaining Defendants) and entered and continued in part (as to Rule 55(b) default judgment on the remaining Defendants). Enter Rule 55(a) default as to the remaining Defendants. If any Defendant wishes to oppose Plaintiff's Rule 55(b) motion for default judgment, that Defendant must file a written opposition by 7/25/2022 or appear at the 7/26/2022 hearing. If Defendants do not respond or appear, the court will rule on the Rule 55(b) motion at the 7/26/2022 hearing. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 7/26/2022 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 7/26/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Motion hearing held. Defendants unopposed motion for extension of time to respond #36 is granted. The deadline for Defendants #1 (568beach), #19 (completeness66), #26 (Ertingbafany), #27 (excurse), #34 (huangjiaxinss), #36 (Ibuywill), #38 (Kaikaistore), #41 (Kind-hearted), #68 (shuddering), #76 (tianhaoyury), #79 (tolerantlly), #85 (Woopower), #94 (yingmande7), and #96 (zhengyejie) to file a responsive pleading is extended to 7/28/2022. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment with the exception of certain Defendants #40 is granted in part (as to a Rule 55(a) entry of default on the remaining Defendants) and entered and continued in part (as to Rule 55(b) default judgment on the remaining Defendants). Enter Rule 55(a) default as to the remaining Defendants. If any Defendant wishes to oppose Plaintiff's Rule 55(b) motion for default judgment, that Defendant must file a written opposition by 7/25/2022 or appear at the 7/26/2022 hearing. If Defendants do not respond or appear, the court will rule on the Rule 55(b) motion at the 7/26/2022 hearing. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 7/26/2022 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19640044. (Goonan, Gregory) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the Plaintiffs' request, motion for order to show cause #37 and motion to stay and for discovery #38 are withdrawn. The motion hearing set for 7/7/2022 #39 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Intersport Corp., Wham-O Holding, Ltd. Notice of Dismissal as to Defendant Nos. 30 GONEBIN & 95 Ysiuefos [7-15 Days Delivery] (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to appear pro hac vice #45 is granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19611350. (Goodman, Eric) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for leave to file [Certain] Documents Under Seal (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cm, ) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, ) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SCHEDULE A to Complaint by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. (Vogt, Keith) Modified on 6/27/2022 (jn, ). (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Wham-O Holding, Ltd., Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19469318. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where INTERSPORT CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA WHAM-O is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory P Goonan