This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/08/2022 at 14:00:51 (UTC).

Wham-O Holding, Ltd. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 Wham-O Holding, Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrea R. Wood. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02158

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrea R. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wham-O Holding, Ltd.

Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Lafunxinn

baby921shop

big99store

bluestartshop

dillery

duytapstore

hanhhanhstore

hanhnhiistore

Happy package

Hippie's store

hoaflowerstore

hong92_store

lanjerryshop

minhblackstore

minhngocstore

phuongbabystore

QWUE

212 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Keith A. Vogt

Attorney at Keith Vogt, Ltd.

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Adam Grodman

Attorney at Jiangip Llc

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yanling Jiang

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yi Bu

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorney

Jiyuan Zhang

Attorney at J. Zhang And Associates, P.c.

13620 38Th Avenue, Unit 11G

Flushing, NY 11354

 

Court Documents

#41

(#41) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#40

(#40) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic motion hearing held on 6/28/2022. Only Plaintiff appears. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' motion for entry of default and default judgment against the Defendants identified in First Amended Schedule A #33 is granted. Plaintiff shall submit an updated proposed final judgment order to the Court's proposed order inbox. All claims as to all Defendants having been resolved, the case is closed. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#39

(#39) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#38

(#38) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#37

(#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiffs have filed a motion for entry of default and default judgment against the Defendants identified in First Amended Schedule A #33 The motion will be heard at the telephonic hearing set for 6/28/2022 at 9:00 AM. Any party wishing to be heard on the motion shall file an appearance and contact the courtroom deputy (david_lynn@ilnd.uscourts.gov) for instructions on how to join the call. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#36

(#36) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#35

(#35) NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for default judgment #33 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 6/28/2022 at 09:00 AM. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

34 #2

Exhibit 2

#33

(#33) MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#2

(#2) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic motion hearing held on 6/28/2022. Only Plaintiff appears. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' motion for entry of default and default judgment against the Defendants identified in First Amended Schedule A #33 is granted. Plaintiff shall submit an updated proposed final judgment order to the Court's proposed order inbox. All claims as to all Defendants having been resolved, the case is closed. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiffs have filed a motion for entry of default and default judgment against the Defendants identified in First Amended Schedule A #33 The motion will be heard at the telephonic hearing set for 6/28/2022 at 9:00 AM. Any party wishing to be heard on the motion shall file an appearance and contact the courtroom deputy (david_lynn@ilnd.uscourts.gov) for instructions on how to join the call. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for default judgment #33 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 6/28/2022 at 09:00 AM. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MEMORANDUM by Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. in support of motion for default judgment #33 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for leave to file [Certain] Documents Under Seal (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jmk, ) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jmk, ) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Wham-O Holding, Ltd., Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19378151. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jiyuan Zhang