This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2022 at 10:39:32 (UTC).

Wham-O Holding, Ltd. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 Wham-O Holding, Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert M. Dow, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01881

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert M. Dow, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wham-O Holding, Ltd.

Intersport Corp. doing business as WHAM-O

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

vvtuofly store

Oziral

Oenbopo_Store

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Yi Bu

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Keith A. Vogt

Attorney at Keith Vogt, Ltd.

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Adam Grodman

Attorney at Jiangip Llc

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yanling Jiang

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Jiyuan Zhang

Attorney at J. Zhang And Associates, P.c.

13620 38Th Avenue, Unit 11G

Flushing, NY 11354

David Silver

Attorney at Bayramoglu Law Offices Llc

1540 West Warm Springs Road, Suite 100

Henderson, NV 89014

Adam Edward Urbanczyk

Attorney at Au LLC

564 W. Ranolph St., Ste 2Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60661

Brian Swift

Attorney at Au Llc

564 West Randolph Street, 2Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60661

 

Court Documents

#44

(#44) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held telephonically. Motion by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp., Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A #35 is granted. Unopposed motion by Defendant Oenbopo_Store for extension of time #39 is granted. A further telephone conference is set for 6/27/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Participants should use the Court's toll-free, call-in number 877-336-1829, passcode is 6963747. This is a Court proceeding. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing by using the same call-in information listed above. Please NOTE: the general prohibition against recording and rebroadcasting of Court proceedings. Your telephone should be on MUTE. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Signed order to follow. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#43

(#43) STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of Dismissal as to Def No. 105 Oziral (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#42

(#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment #35 will be heard telephonically on 6/9/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Participants should use the Court's toll-free, call-in number 877-336-1829, passcode is 6963747. Defendant Oenbopo_Store's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #39 is granted to and including 6/27/2022 to facilitate settlement discussions. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#41

(#41) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Oenbopo_Store by Brian Swift (Swift, Brian) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#40

(#40) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#39

(#39) MOTION by Defendant Oenbopo_Store for extension of time UNOPPOSED (Urbanczyk, Adam) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#38

(#38) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Oenbopo_Store by Adam Edward Urbanczyk (Urbanczyk, Adam) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#37

(#37) NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for default judgment #35 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 6/9/2022 at 09:00 AM. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#35

(#35) MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp., Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#2) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held telephonically. Motion by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp., Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A #35 is granted. Unopposed motion by Defendant Oenbopo_Store for extension of time #39 is granted. A further telephone conference is set for 6/27/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Participants should use the Court's toll-free, call-in number 877-336-1829, passcode is 6963747. This is a Court proceeding. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing by using the same call-in information listed above. Please NOTE: the general prohibition against recording and rebroadcasting of Court proceedings. Your telephone should be on MUTE. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Signed order to follow. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of Dismissal as to Def No. 105 Oziral (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment #35 will be heard telephonically on 6/9/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Participants should use the Court's toll-free, call-in number 877-336-1829, passcode is 6963747. Defendant Oenbopo_Store's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #39 is granted to and including 6/27/2022 to facilitate settlement discussions. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Oenbopo_Store by Brian Swift (Swift, Brian) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION by Defendant Oenbopo_Store for extension of time UNOPPOSED (Urbanczyk, Adam) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Oenbopo_Store by Adam Edward Urbanczyk (Urbanczyk, Adam) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for default judgment #35 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 6/9/2022 at 09:00 AM. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MEMORANDUM by Intersport Corp., Wham-O Holding, Ltd. in support of motion for default judgment #35 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp., Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for leave to file [Certain] Documents Under Seal (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ak, ) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, ) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Wham-O Holding, Ltd., Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19334626. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where INTERSPORT CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA WHAM-O is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jiyuan Zhang