This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/23/2022 at 07:23:34 (UTC).

Wham-O Holding Ltd. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 03/24/2022 Wham-O Holding Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrea R. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01533

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrea R. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wham-O Holding Ltd.

Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O

Intersport Corp. doing business as WHAM-O

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

4Flows in you

Ada R Bland

Antonia R Back

bevismimjzo

bobosuperman

Breadrolls

Carl C Kenna

Cbsua

Charles B Cochran

emmetq4prwgbge

Fannday

Fernande

forasno2

francisk

Futurelife1

Harry

144 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Grodman

Attorney at Jiangip Llc

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yanling Jiang

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yi Bu

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Keith A. Vogt

Attorney at Keith Vogt, Ltd.

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#29

(#29) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#28

(#28) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/12/2022. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#27

(#27) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic motion hearing held on 5/12/2022. Only Plaintiffs appear. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #23 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. Any Defendant wishing to be heard regarding vacating or modifying the preliminary injunction shall file the appropriate motion and contact the courtroom deputy (david_lynn@ilnd.uscourts.gov) for a hearing date. The Clerk is directed to unseal Schedule A to the complaint #2 , Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Todd Richards #14 and the temporary restraining order #17 . Jiangip LLC is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days, instructions can be found on the court's website www.ilnd.courts.com/instructions. Telephonic status hearing set for 6/28/2022 at 10:00 AM. Any motion for default judgment filed by 6/21/2022 may be noticed for 6/28/2022 at 10:00 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

26 #26

Main Document

#23

(#25) NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #23 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/12/2022 at 09:45 AM. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#17

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding Ltd. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding Ltd. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding Ltd. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Wham-O Holding Ltd., Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19276983. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: China*toy Store added to case caption. (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Entertainment outdoors Store, FLeur daily life dropship Store, Football fans Store, FoPcc Kids Toy's Store, Frank camping Store, Handmade Decorative Painting Store, HeroBaby Store, hibabys Official Store, JeanDan Store-ufza Store, JIAINF Official Store, Jo Toy Store, LovelyBaby Dropshipping Store, luck F Life Store, MayBeaus Grobal Store, MezoJaoie Store, MHORLX Store, MINOCOOL Official Store, MINOCOOL Toy Store, Mollyman's Store, Orienter GIrl Store, powerest seller, Rimdoc Airtrack Store, S-E-T Store, See World Store, shop DCL 123 Store, Shop5244255 Store, Shop900237087 Store, The GOvogue Store, Toy heaven Store, Toy Store-fplm Store, Welcome to Mommy Baby Store, Welifes Store, Wingmore Industries(Shanghai) Co.,Ltd, Wonder-life Store, Wonne Store, xinyimanman Store, XJ model Store, Yi Yun XM Store, Yoly Baby Store, Your liking Store and Zcreen Toy Friend Store added to case caption. (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: ginsu, Happy ZRUK, henispham, HJX-US Store, Jinyijia shop, Kisterio, LIKELA, LinFenShiYaoDuQuQingGeFuShiDian, LOVESTORY, MECKAI, MHong, MOZOOSON DIRECT, oufenli, PUREUS, QUIRT, rowna, RSTJ-US, Samsports, Seltochum, shijiazhuang456, shjiawu, Sichuanwangyushengnanshangmaogongsi, soarflight, SOLALO 001, stLiope, Sukaly, SupVoteR, Swilpool-US, Teiim, uscllddp, vwlvrsco, W&D WillCol, wangxiao hi, Wayda, We Home, weemoment, WESJOY, Window-pick, Winsbo Technology (GuangZhou)Co.,Limited, Winter-snow, Wonderful Industry ltd, XD Sports, xiamenkeerzheng, YANG DIRECT, Yasongqipeicheng, ZGYUSA, Aliyy Store, All child toy Store, Baby Future Store, Baby Growth Diary Store, Beautiful Pop Store, Beavertoy Store, bubble wish Official Store, Childhood Period Toy Store, Children Life Store, children's party 233 Store, Comfort Pets Store, DHSM Toy Store and Dropshipping Wholesales Store added to case caption. (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: 4Flows in you, Ada R Bland, Antonia R Back, bevismimjzo, bobosuperman, Breadrolls, Carl C Kenna, Cbsua, Charles B Cochran, emmetq4prwgbge, Fannday, Fernande, forasno2, francisk, Futurelife1, Harry, Home & Garden HK, ITech Trading Co.,Ltd, ivkhwrrg, Judy C Walton, Justtrytry1, kesana, laixiuyibo, Liangni Store, linyanliang, lukh1989, LUOSHIJIAJU, Luqiann, Maruoing Shop, mayanling, rishoughkatb, Typhoon, Vikaka, vistina, WeiyeIndustry, weshopws, willstar, xhxinhua196602032, Xiatianday, yeqingqing0746, yuk8mbx3.xiulian, zhneg8529Hier, Zpniomo, 59867, AALUCKY, ACTION AIR, Aidennorwolf, Bang Yisu, BaoQiHuaDong, BerryChipsVeryCheap, BOGOU, Cadeaux4U, ceemes, ChuJun US, Coopark-US, Dapengsuocheng, DEBESDM, Durianpie, Ectboad and Felerin added to case caption. (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/12/2022. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic motion hearing held on 5/12/2022. Only Plaintiffs appear. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #23 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. Any Defendant wishing to be heard regarding vacating or modifying the preliminary injunction shall file the appropriate motion and contact the courtroom deputy (david_lynn@ilnd.uscourts.gov) for a hearing date. The Clerk is directed to unseal Schedule A to the complaint #2 , Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Todd Richards #14 and the temporary restraining order #17 . Jiangip LLC is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days, instructions can be found on the court's website www.ilnd.courts.com/instructions. Telephonic status hearing set for 6/28/2022 at 10:00 AM. Any motion for default judgment filed by 6/21/2022 may be noticed for 6/28/2022 at 10:00 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wham-O Holding Ltd., Intersport Corp. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 5/10/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #23 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/12/2022 at 09:45 AM. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding Ltd. for leave to file under seal (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jxj, ) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jxj, ) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding Ltd. by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding Ltd. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding Ltd. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding Ltd. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding Ltd. Schedule A to Complaint (1) (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Wham-O Holding Ltd., Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19276983. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRY DBA: DAN V. AUTO is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant