This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/14/2022 at 08:40:13 (UTC).

Wham-O Holding, Ltd. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 Wham-O Holding, Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Edmond E. Chang. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01352

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmond E. Chang

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wham-O Holding, Ltd.

Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O

Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O doing business as WHAM-O

Defendant

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Grodman

Attorney at Jiangip Llc

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yanling Jiang

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yi Bu

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Keith A. Vogt

Attorney at Keith Vogt, Ltd.

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

31 #1

Closing Minute Entry dated 4/26/2022

31 #31

Main Document

#30

(#30) ENTERED JUDGMENT Signed by the courtroom deputy on 04/26/2022. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#29

(#29) DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER Signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 04/26/2022. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#28

(#28) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the absence of a timely answer, the motion for default judgment #26 is granted in the amount of $15,000 against each separate Defendant. Given the establishment of willfulness pursuant to the default, a permanent injunction shall issue. A separate AO-450 judgment shall be entered. The tracking status hearing of 05/06/2022 is vacated. Civil case terminated. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

27 #3

Declaration of Keith A. Vogt

27 #1

Exhibit 1

27 #27

Main Document

#26

(#26) MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#8) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. [Amended] Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (Attachments: #1 Closing Minute Entry dated 4/26/2022) (jh, ) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ENTERED JUDGMENT Signed by the courtroom deputy on 04/26/2022. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER Signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 04/26/2022. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the absence of a timely answer, the motion for default judgment #26 is granted in the amount of $15,000 against each separate Defendant. Given the establishment of willfulness pursuant to the default, a permanent injunction shall issue. A separate AO-450 judgment shall be entered. The tracking status hearing of 05/06/2022 is vacated. Civil case terminated. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MEMORANDUM by Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. in support of motion for default judgment #26 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STATUS Report Initial Status Report by Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 4/1/2022:On review of the Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction #21 , the motion is granted in light of the continued applicability of the facts that justified entry of the TRO. Given the answer deadline of 04/20/2022, the tracking status hearing of 04/15/2022 is reset to 05/06/2022 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the parties shall file the joint initial status report by 04/27/2022. If the Defendants do not answer by the 04/20/2022 deadline, then they are deemed to be in default on 04/21/2022 and the Plaintiffs shall file a motion for default judgment on 04/27/2022. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wham-O Holding, Ltd., Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 3/30/2022, answer due 4/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MEMORANDUM by Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #21 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1, Declaration of Keith A. Vogt)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. [Amended] Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ak, ) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, ) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Wham-O Holding, Ltd., Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19246759. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where INTERSPORT CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA WHAM-O is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Grodman