This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2022 at 09:02:48 (UTC).

Wham-O Holding, Ltd. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 03/03/2022 Wham-O Holding, Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrea R. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01114

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrea R. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wham-O Holding, Ltd.

Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

BOVN

AMAOTES

24 Hours Online

A leaf

AAPP SHOP

Abzan

ADpossible

Aksop

akwq818

aliveGOT

AMBestker

AMZchoice-US

Amzeminem-Kling

AMZRFLOW0

Aousan

arltcx

ASUYOERU

233 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Grodman

Attorney at Jiangip Llc

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yanling Jiang

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yi Bu

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Keith A. Vogt

Attorney at Keith Vogt, Ltd.

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Ruoting Men

Attorney at Glacier Law PLLC

200 East Randolph, Suite 5100

Chicago, IL 60601

Tao Liu

Attorney at Glacier Law LLP

200 Park Avenue, Suite 1703

New York, NY 10166

Adam Edward Urbanczyk

Attorney at AU LLC

564 W. Randolph St. 2Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60661

Other Attorneys

Larry Ford Banister, II

Attorney at Ford Banister IP

305 Broadway - Floor 7

New York, NY 10007

Charles Edward McElvenny

Attorney at Law Offices of Charles E. McElvenny

33 N Dearborn, Suite 1000

Chicago, IL 60602

Lydia Pittaway

Attorney at Pittaway Law Pllc

133 S 2Nd St Ste 101

Ft. Pierce, FL 34950

Yong Chen

Attorney at Liu, Chen & Hoffman Llp

One Penn Plaza, Ste 2508

New York, NY 10119

 

Court Documents

#50

(#50) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#49

(#49) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

11 #4

Exhibit 1, of Todd Richards' declaration

11 #3

Declaration of Todd Richards

11 #2

Exhibit 1-4, of Keith A. Vogt's declaration

11 #1

Declaration of Keith A. Vogt

#11

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

(#8) MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for leave to file under seal (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • Docket(#47) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic status hearing held on 4/22/2022. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendants Concelery, Quinn Guy, TOPmontain, Jilike, A leaf, Forfar Direct, ChenZhenFeng, LovelifeUS, EVOIO, HugeStone, and JS LifeStyle appear. Defendant TaoWang's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #45 is granted. Defendant Tao Wang shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 4/22/2022. As discussed on the record, Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment against the Defendants identified in first amended Schedule A #31 is taken under advisement. Telephonic status hearing set for 5/19/2022 at 9:00 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • Docket(#46) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time #35 is granted. Defendants TOPmontain, Jilike, A leaf, Forfar Direct, ChenZhenFeng, LovelifeUS, EVOIO, HugeStone, JS LifeStyle shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 5/5/2022. Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #39 is granted. Defendants CRIMSONCOLE, decwang, divdual, eventura, ferentia, greatiboon, Greenyouth, jsodia, Kerdena, Maxten, mgjrhu, nicything, oilmath, Rhinoon, Rinme, shangfu-team, shoelacei, Tavot, Trysain, Ya-tube, ZEBYING and Zhifou shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 5/12/2022. Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to respond #42 is granted. Defnedants Concelery and Quinn Guy shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 5/3/2022. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • Docket(#44) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Concelery, Quinn Guy by Charles Edward McElvenny (McElvenny, Charles) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • Docket(#45) MOTION by Defendant Tao Wang for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead. (nsf, ) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • Docket(#42) MOTION by Defendants Concelery, Quinn Guy for extension of time to file responsive pleading to Complaint (D.E. 1) (Pittaway, Lydia) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • Docket(#41) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Concelery, Quinn Guy by Lydia Pittaway (Pittaway, Lydia) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for leave to file under seal (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (exr, ) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, ) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Wham-O Holding, Ltd., Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19210866. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yong Chen