This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2022 at 07:57:43 (UTC).

Wham-O Holding, Ltd. et al v. Guangzhou Aurora Sports Products Co. Ltd.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 Wham-O Holding, Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Guangzhou Aurora Sports Products Co Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00050

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wham-O Holding, Ltd.

Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Guangzhou Aurora Sports Products Co., Ltd.

Guangzhou Barry Industrial Co., Ltd.

Guangzhou Caixin Inflatable Products Co., Ltd.

Guangzhou Infinity Technology Co., Ltd.

Guangzhou Joyshine Amusement Equipment Co., Ltd.

Guangzhou Linzhen Toys Co., Ltd.

Guangzhou Shao Xiong Toys Co., Ltd.

Guangzhou YL Inflatables Limited

Henan YZ Amusement Equipment Co., Ltd.

Ningbo Zhuodi Trading Co., Ltd.

Sunway Amusement Equipment Guangzhou Limited

Zhengzhou IBL Amusement Equipment Co., Ltd.

aljinad

blueskysea001

bullyinternational

china_2019

de-176795

209 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Grodman

Attorney at Jiangip Llc

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yanling Jiang

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yi Bu

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Keith A. Vogt

Attorney at Keith Vogt, Ltd.

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Other Attorneys

Timothy Tiewei Wang

Attorney at Ni, Wang & Massand Pllc

8140 Walnut Hill Lane, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75231

Yong Chen

Attorney at Liu, Chen & Hoffman Llp

One Penn Plaza, Ste 2508

New York, NY 10119

Shengmao Mu

Attorney at Whitewood Law Pllc

57 West, 57Th Street, 3Rd And 4Th Floors

New York, NY 10019

Adam Edward Urbanczyk

Attorney at AU LLC

564 W. Randolph St. 2Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60661

 

Court Documents

#51

(#51) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#50

(#50) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#49

(#49) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Unopposed motion of defendants friendly home (No. 92) and Lovely friend (No. 109 for extension of time #47 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 3/17/2022. (mk) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#48

(#48) DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER (as to certain defendants) Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/24/2022: Motion for default judgment #45 is granted. (mk) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#47

(#47) MOTION by Defendants Lovely friend, friendly home for extension of time UNOPPOSED (Urbanczyk, Adam) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

46 #2

Exhibit 2

46 #1

Exhibit 1

#46

(#46) MEMORANDUM by Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. in support of motion for default judgment #45 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#45

(#45) MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#2) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Unopposed motion of defendants friendly home (No. 92) and Lovely friend (No. 109 for extension of time #47 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 3/17/2022. (mk) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER (as to certain defendants) Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/24/2022: Motion for default judgment #45 is granted. (mk) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MOTION by Defendants Lovely friend, friendly home for extension of time UNOPPOSED (Urbanczyk, Adam) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MEMORANDUM by Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. in support of motion for default judgment #45 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Lovely friend, Toy Home of Kids, friendly home by Adam Edward Urbanczyk (Urbanczyk, Adam) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant FADECOR by Shengmao Mu (Mu, Shengmao) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for leave to file excess pages (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for leave to file [Certain] Documents Under Seal (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, ) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O, Wham-O Holding, Ltd. Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Wham-O Holding, Ltd., Intersport Corp. d/b/a Wham-O; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19021765. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yong Chen