This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2021 at 09:11:48 (UTC).

Whaley v. Weldon et al

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 Whaley filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Weldon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Corey L Maze. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01963

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Corey L Maze

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Whaley

Defendants

Nick Weldon

Kevin Akins

David Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Henry F Sherrod, III

Attorney at HENRY F SHERROD III PC

119 South Court Street

Florence, AL 35630

Defendant Attorney

Robert C Lockwood

Attorney at WILMER & LEE PA

100 Washington Street, Suite 200, P O Box 2168

Huntsville, AL 35804

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lockwood, Robert) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#7

(#7) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS- with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 1/13/2021. (SRD) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kevin Akins, David Smith, Nick Weldon.(Lockwood, Robert) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons and Complaint as to David Smith Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee on 12/18/2020 by Jennifer Whaley. (MEB2) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Whaley. Kevin Akins served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021; Nick Weldon served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (MEB2) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Kevin Akins, David Smith, Nick Weldon. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Jennifer Whaley. (SRD) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jennifer Whaley.(SRD) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lockwood, Robert) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS- with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 1/13/2021. (SRD) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kevin Akins, David Smith, Nick Weldon.(Lockwood, Robert) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons and Complaint as to David Smith Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee on 12/18/2020 by Jennifer Whaley. (MEB2) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Whaley. Kevin Akins served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021; Nick Weldon served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (MEB2) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Kevin Akins, David Smith, Nick Weldon. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3731976 (B4601110160). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jennifer Whaley.(SRD). (Sherrod, Henry) Modified on 12/10/2020 (MEB2). (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Jennifer Whaley. (SRD) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jennifer Whaley.(SRD) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Henry F. Sherrod, III