This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/03/2020 at 10:07:55 (UTC).

W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP v. Terumo Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/04/2020 W H Wall Family Holdings, LLLP filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Terumo Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00713

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP

Defendant

Terumo Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan E. Dornberger

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2800 Jpmorgan Chase Tower, 600 Travis

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

Paul V. Storm

Attorney at Foley Gardere

2021 Mckinney Ave., Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

8 #5

Proposed Order

8 #4

Exhibit 2

8 #3

Exhibit 1

8 #2

Affidavit of Ryan E. Dornberger

8 #1

Memo in Support

#8

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order WITHDRAWING #8 Motion entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP. (Dornberger, Ryan) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Withdrawal by W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP re #8 MOTION for Leave to Effect Alternative Service (Dornberger, Ryan) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Effect Alternative Service by W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Affidavit of Ryan E. Dornberger, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Proposed Order)(Dornberger, Ryan) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Terumo Corporation. (am) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro Hac Vice Letter to W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP. (am) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Dornberger, Ryan) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP. (Dornberger, Ryan) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP. (Dornberger, Ryan) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13828957), filed by W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dornberger, Ryan) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Standing Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19 Court Procedures)(mc5) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan E. Dornberger