This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/03/2020 at 10:07:47 (UTC).

W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP v. Merit Medical Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2020 W H Wall Family Holdings, LLLP filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Merit Medical Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00712

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP

Defendant

Merit Medical Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan E. Dornberger

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2800 Jpmorgan Chase Tower, 600 Travis

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#7

7 #1

Supplemental Standing Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19 Court Procedures

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#8

#9

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP (Dornberger, Ryan) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP. Merit Medical Systems, Inc. served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Dornberger, Ryan) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Merit Medical Systems, Inc.. (am) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro Hac Vice Letter to W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP. (am) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Dornberger, Ryan) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP. (Dornberger, Ryan) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP. (Dornberger, Ryan) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13828648), filed by W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dornberger, Ryan) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Standing Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19 Court Procedures)(mc5) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less