This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/06/2021 at 09:56:20 (UTC).

Weyerhaeuser Company et al v. AIG Property Casualty Inc et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 Weyerhaeuser Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AIG Property Casualty Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles F. Eick and Fernando M. Olguin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03886

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Weyerhaeuser Company

Aspen Insurance UK Limited

Weyerhaeuser NR Company

Defendants and Counter Claimants

National Interstate Insurance Company

AIG Claims, Inc.

First Mercury Insurance Company

Lexington Insurance Company

The North River Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Michael A. Moore

Jocelyn J. Whiteley

Kelly H. Sheridan

Belinda M Vega

Miles J.M. Stewart

Bruce D May

Eliot M. Harris

Shane P Criqui

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Alexander Eugene Potente

Bradley Robert Harding

Aldo Emmanuel Ibarra

Dawn N Valentine

 

Court Documents

#106

#105

#103

#102

#101

#100

#99

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

93 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#106) ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#105) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Jury Trial set for 5/24/2022 at 8:45 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for dates, deadlines and requirements imposed.* (vdr) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#104) NOTICE of Filing of Documents from Other District filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant National Interstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 ECF 1 through 1-2, #2 ECF 1-3, #3 ECF 2 through 2-16, #4 ECF 3, #5 ECF 4, #6 ECF 5, #7 ECF 6, #8 ECF 7, #9 ECF 8, #10 ECF 9, #11 ECF 10, #12 ECF 11, #13 ECF 12 through 12-1, #14 ECF 13, #15 ECF 14, #16 ECF 14-1 through 14-3, #17 ECF 14-4 through 14-18, #18 ECF 14-19 through 14-30, #19 ECF 14-31, #20 ECF 15, #21 ECF 16, #22 ECF 17, #23 ECF 18, #24 ECF 19 through 19-1, #25 ECF 20 through 20-1, #26 ECF 21, #27 ECF 22, #28 ECF 23, #29 ECF 24, #30 ECF 25, #31 ECF 25-1, #32 ECF 26, #33 ECF 26-1, #34 ECF 27 through 27-16, #35 ECF 28, #36 ECF 29, #37 ECF 30, #38 ECF 31 through 31-2, #39 ECF 32 through 32-3, #40 ECF 33, #41 ECF 34 through 34-1, #42 ECF 35 through 35-1, #43 ECF 35-2, #44 ECF 36 through 36-7, #45 ECF 37, #46 ECF 38 through 38-3, #47 ECF 39 through 39-7, #48 ECF 40 through 40-1, #49 ECF 41, #50 ECF 41-1, #51 ECF 42, #52 ECF 43, #53 ECF 44, #54 ECF 45, #55 ECF 46 through 46-3, #56 ECF 47, #57 ECF 48, #58 ECF 49 through 49-1, #59 ECF 50, #60 ECF 50-1, #61 ECF 51, #62 ECF 52, #63 ECF 53, #64 ECF 54, #65 ECF 55, #66 ECF 55-1, #67 ECF 56 through 56-8, #68 ECF 57, #69 ECF 58, #70 ECF 59, #71 ECF 60)(Harding, Bradley) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#103) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bradley Robert Harding on behalf of Defendant National Interstate Insurance Company, Counter Claimant National Interstate Insurance Company (Attorney Bradley Robert Harding added to party National Interstate Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley Robert Harding added to party National Interstate Insurance Company(pty:cc))(Harding, Bradley) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#102) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew S Harvey on behalf of Defendant National Interstate Insurance Company, Counter Claimant National Interstate Insurance Company (Attorney Matthew S Harvey added to party National Interstate Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew S Harvey added to party National Interstate Insurance Company(pty:cc))(Harvey, Matthew) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#101) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bruce Daniel Celebrezze on behalf of Defendant National Interstate Insurance Company, Counter Claimant National Interstate Insurance Company (Attorney Bruce Daniel Celebrezze added to party National Interstate Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Daniel Celebrezze added to party National Interstate Insurance Company(pty:cc))(Celebrezze, Bruce) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#100) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Scott P Ward on behalf of Defendants First Mercury Insurance Company, The North River Insurance Company (Attorney Scott P Ward added to party First Mercury Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Scott P Ward added to party The North River Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Ward, Scott) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#99) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #91 Non-Resident Attorney Jocelyn J. Whiteley APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Weyerhaeuser Company and Weyerhaeuser NR Company, designating Belinda M. Vega as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#98) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #90 Non-Resident Attorney Kelly H. Sheridan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Weyerhaeuser Company and Weyerhaeuser NR Company, designating Belinda M. Vega as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#97) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #89 Non-Resident Attorney Michael A. Moore APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Weyerhaeuser Company and Weyerhaeuser NR Company, designating Belinda M. Vega as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
93 More Docket Entries
09/24/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint; and Affirmative Defenses with JURY DEMAND Attorney Robert A Meyers added to party National Interstate Insurance Company(pty:dft) by National Interstate Insurance Company.(Meyers, Robert) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/12/2021.] (Entered: 09/24/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Weyerhaeuser Company for Weyerhaeuser NR Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Weyerhaeuser NR Company (Moore, Michael) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/12/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Weyerhaeuser Company (Moore, Michael) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/12/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent United States Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent FFHL Group Ltd., Corporate Parent Crum & Forster Holdings, Corp., Corporate Parent Fairfax, (US) Inc. for The North River Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The North River Insurance Company (Lether, Thomas) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/12/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent United States Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent FFHL Group Ltd., Corporate Parent Fairfax, Inc., Corporate Parent Crum & Forster Holdings, Corp. for First Mercury Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by First Mercury Insurance Company (Lether, Thomas) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/12/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/12/2021.] (Entered: 09/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2020

DocketJudge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (RE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/12/2021.] (Entered: 09/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2020

DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) Weyerhaeuser Company, Weyerhaeuser NR Company and Aspen Insurance UK Limited, and Defendant(s) First Mercury Insurance Company and The North River Insurance Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/25/2020. (RE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/12/2021.] (Entered: 09/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants First Mercury Insurance Company, The North River Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Lether, Thomas) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/12/2021.] (Entered: 09/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-12152-5 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6605619), filed by First Mercury Insurance Company, The North River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lether, Thomas) [Transferred from Washington Western on 5/12/2021.] (Entered: 09/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less