This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/26/2022 at 07:53:36 (UTC).

Wethington v. Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2022 Wethington filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Greg N. Stivers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00020

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg N. Stivers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Katherine Wethington

Defendants

Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency doing business as Fed Loan Servicing Company

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Trans Union, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. Hemminger

Attorney at Hemminger Law Office, PSC

331 Townepark Cir., Suite 100-C

Louisville, KY 40243

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Tendered

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (MNM) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency, and Trans Union, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). Clerk emailed counsel attested copy of Complaint. (MNM) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 3/28/2022 granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. cc: Counsel (JM) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 3/28/2022 granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. cc: Counsel (JM) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Plaintiff Katherine Wethington (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hemminger, David) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency, and Trans Union, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). Clerk emailed counsel attested copy of Complaint. (MNM) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (MNM) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency, and Trans Union, LLC. Filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3532534, filed by Katherine Wethington. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. Hemminger