This case was last updated from PACER on 10/31/2020 at 09:29:57 (UTC).

Westover v. Saul

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 Westover filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William C Griesbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01347

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C Griesbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elizabeth Westover

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dana W Duncan

Attorney at Duncan Disability Law SC

555 Birch St

Nekoosa, WI 54457

Defendant Attorneys

Social Security Administration

Attorney at United States Social Security Administration

600 W Madison St - 6Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60661-2474

Brian E Pawlak

Attorney at United States Department of Justice (ED-WI)

517 E Wisconsin Ave - Rm 530

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 9/2/2020 Granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/2/2020) (mac).

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/9/2020. (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Briefing Letter transmitted to the parties: Plaintiffs brief due 12/24/2020; Defendants response due 2/2/2021; Plaintiffs reply due 2/17/2021. (cc: all counsel) (cav)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail. US Attorney General served on 9/9/2020. (cav)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketTransmit Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 9/2/2020 Granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/2/2020) (mac).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Elizabeth Westover. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Duncan, Dana)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Elizabeth Westover. (Duncan, Dana)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Elizabeth Westover. (Duncan, Dana)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul by Elizabeth Westover. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duncan, Dana)

    Read MoreRead Less