This case was last updated from PACER on 09/12/2020 at 08:56:06 (UTC).

Westfield Insurance v. Coverall North America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 Westfield Insurance filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Coverall North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrea R. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04133

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrea R. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Westfield Insurance

Defendant

Coverall North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Teirney S Christenson

Attorney at Yost & Baill, Llp

2675 N Mayfair Rd. Suite 600

Milwaukee, WI 53226

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Westfield Insurance as to Coverall North America, Inc. on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Christenson, Teirney) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Westfield Insurance regarding Summons & Complaint served on Coverall North America, Inc. on 8/26/2020 (Christenson, Teirney) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The telephonic initial status hearing set for 9/10/2020 is stricken and reset for 9/30/2020 at 9:45 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The deadline for the parties to file their initial joint status report as required by the Court's 7/14/2020 order #5 is extended to 9/23/2020. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 9/10/2020 at 9:30 AM. The status hearing will proceed by telephone conference. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice. (dal, ) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Westfield Insurance (Christenson, Teirney) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Westfield Insurance by Teirney S Christenson (Christenson, Teirney) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Christenson, Teirney) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Westfield Insurance; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17214535.(Christenson, Teirney) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Westfield Insurance as to Coverall North America, Inc. on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Christenson, Teirney) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Westfield Insurance regarding Summons & Complaint served on Coverall North America, Inc. on 8/26/2020 (Christenson, Teirney) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The telephonic initial status hearing set for 9/10/2020 is stricken and reset for 9/30/2020 at 9:45 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The deadline for the parties to file their initial joint status report as required by the Court's 7/14/2020 order #5 is extended to 9/23/2020. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Coverall North America, Inc. (mp, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 9/10/2020 at 9:30 AM. The status hearing will proceed by telephone conference. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice. (dal, ) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, ) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Westfield Insurance (Christenson, Teirney) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Westfield Insurance by Teirney S Christenson (Christenson, Teirney) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Christenson, Teirney) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Westfield Insurance; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17214535.(Christenson, Teirney) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COVERALL NORTH AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Teirney S Christenson