Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2020 at 11:35:29 (UTC).

Westfield Insurance Company v. JNR Builders, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Westfield Insurance Company filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against JNR Builders, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Yvette Kane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01754

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Yvette Kane

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Westfield Insurance Company

Defendant

JNR Builders, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth T. Levine

Attorney at de Luca Levine LLC

Three Valley Square, Suite 220

Blue Bell, PA 19422

Defendant Attorney

Scott L. Grenoble

Attorney at Buzgon Davis Law Offices

P.O. Box 49, 525 South 8Th Street

Lebanon, PA 17042

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: AND NOW, on this 19th day of November 2020, IT IS ORDERED THAT the Case Management Conference currently set for January 7, 2021, is RESCHEDULED to January 14, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. The Joint Case Management Plan shall be filed on or before January 7, 2021. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the conference call. The telephone number for purposes of this call is (717) 221-3990. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/19/20. (dmn) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#9

(#9) Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by JNR Builders, LLC.(Grenoble, Scott) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: A Case Management conference will be conducted by the court on January 7, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. The court prefers to hold this conference by telephone. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate this telephone conference. The telephone number of the court is 717-221-3990. Counsel should be prepared to address any pending motions at the conference. Counsel are advised to comply with Rule 16.3(a) of the Rules of Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Local Rule 16.3 requires lead counsel for each party to meet prior to the case management conference and complete a Joint Case Management Plan form. The completed form, which is set forth in Appendix A of the local rules, must be filed jointly by the parties on or before December 31, 2020. See Order for further details.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/17/20. (dmn) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by JNR Builders, LLC.(Grenoble, Scott) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott L. Grenoble on behalf of JNR Builders, LLC (Grenoble, Scott) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Individual at JNR Builders on 10/2/2020, filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Levine, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Westfield Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Ohio Farmers Insurance Company for Westfield Insurance Company. (Levine, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/29/20. (dmn) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

2 #1

Summons Packet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to JNR Builders, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JNR Builders, LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5269396), filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: AND NOW, on this 19th day of November 2020, IT IS ORDERED THAT the Case Management Conference currently set for January 7, 2021, is RESCHEDULED to January 14, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. The Joint Case Management Plan shall be filed on or before January 7, 2021. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the conference call. The telephone number for purposes of this call is (717) 221-3990. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/19/20. (dmn) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by JNR Builders, LLC.(Grenoble, Scott) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: A Case Management conference will be conducted by the court on January 7, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. The court prefers to hold this conference by telephone. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate this telephone conference. The telephone number of the court is 717-221-3990. Counsel should be prepared to address any pending motions at the conference. Counsel are advised to comply with Rule 16.3(a) of the Rules of Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Local Rule 16.3 requires lead counsel for each party to meet prior to the case management conference and complete a Joint Case Management Plan form. The completed form, which is set forth in Appendix A of the local rules, must be filed jointly by the parties on or before December 31, 2020. See Order for further details.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/17/20. (dmn) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by JNR Builders, LLC.(Grenoble, Scott) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott L. Grenoble on behalf of JNR Builders, LLC (Grenoble, Scott) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Individual at JNR Builders on 10/2/2020, filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Levine, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Westfield Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Ohio Farmers Insurance Company for Westfield Insurance Company. (Levine, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/29/20. (dmn) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to JNR Builders, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JNR Builders, LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5269396), filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JNR Builders, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott L. Grenoble