This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:32:15 (UTC).

Westfall v. USAA Savings Bank

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Westfall filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against USAA Savings Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel J. Albregts and Gloria M. Navarro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02093

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Albregts

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jonathan Westfall

Defendant

USAA Savings Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mathew K. Higbee

Attorney at Higbee & Associates

3110 W. Cheyenne Avenue, Suite 200

North Las Vegas, 89 89128

Defendant Attorneys

David M. Krueger

Attorney at Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff, LLP

200 Public Square, Suite 2300

Cleveland, OH 44114

Nora Katherine Cook

Attorney at Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff LLP

200 Public Square, Suite 2300

Cleveland, OH 44114

Robert W Freeman, Jr.

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

6385 S. Rainbow Blvd., Ste. 600

Las Vegas, NV 89118

Priscilla Louise O'Briant

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bigaard & Smith, LLB

6385 S. Rainbow Boulevard, Ste. 600

Las Vegas, NV 89118

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Index Index of Exhibits

11 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

11 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B

11 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C

#11

(#11) MOTION To Compel Arbitration re #1 Complaint, by Defendant USAA Savings Bank. Responses due by 1/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (O'Briant, Priscilla) Modified event on 1/15/2020 pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) and LR IC 2-2(d) (DKJ). (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against USAA Savings Bank (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5802441) by Jonathan Westfall. Proof of service due by 3/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for USAA Savings Bank)(Higbee, Mathew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #2

Summons for USAA Savings Bank

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 #1

Index of Exhibits

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant USAA Savings Bank. Responses due by 1/29/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (O'Briant, Priscilla) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/15/2020)

8 #4

Exhibit C

8 #3

Exhibit B

8 #2

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by USAA Savings Bank that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent USAA Federal Savings Bank, Other Affiliate United Services Automobile Association, Other Affiliate USAA Capital Corporation for USAA Savings Bank added. (O'Briant, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. USAA Savings Bank answer due 1/15/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant USAA Savings Bank. (O'Briant, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan Westfall re #1 Complaint,. USAA Savings Bank served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to USAA Savings Bank re #1 Complaint. (ADR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Docket Correction to #11 Motion, : ERROR: Incorrect event selected. Court modified the event from a Misc. Motion to a Motion to Compel (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION To Compel Arbitration re #1 Complaint, by Defendant USAA Savings Bank. Responses due by 1/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (O'Briant, Priscilla) Modified event on 1/15/2020 pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) and LR IC 2-2(d) (DKJ). (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #8 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b). For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. Counsel is advised to file ONLY the Motion to Compel located in ECF No. #8 as a separate entry to be in compliance with LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by filing two separate documents for each request or purpose. DO NOT refile the Motion to Dismiss. (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by USAA Savings Bank that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent USAA Federal Savings Bank, Other Affiliate United Services Automobile Association, Other Affiliate USAA Capital Corporation for USAA Savings Bank added. (O'Briant, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant USAA Savings Bank. Responses due by 1/29/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (O'Briant, Priscilla) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. USAA Savings Bank answer due 1/15/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant USAA Savings Bank. (O'Briant, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan Westfall re #1 Complaint,. USAA Savings Bank served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to USAA Savings Bank re #1 Complaint. (ADR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (ADR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jonathan Westfall that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against USAA Savings Bank (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5802441) by Jonathan Westfall. Proof of service due by 3/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for USAA Savings Bank)(Higbee, Mathew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less