This case was last updated from PACER on 02/17/2020 at 13:41:39 (UTC).

Western States Trucking Association v. Xavier Becerra, et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 Western States Trucking Association filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Xavier Becerra. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenly Kiya Kato and Christina A. Snyder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-02447

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

Presiding Judge

Christina A. Snyder

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Western States Trucking Association

Defendants and Petitioners

Xavier Becerra

Western States Trucking Association

Does 1-10

Intervenor Defendant

International Brotherhood of Teamsters

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

Patrick James Whalen

Attorney at Ellison Whalen and Blackburn

1201 K Street Suite 1960

Sacramento, CA 95814

Kirk Lonon Blackburn

Attorney at Ellison Whalen and Blackburn

1201 K Street Suite 1960

Sacramento, CA 95814

Defendant Attorney

Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda

Attorney at CAAG - Office of Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

Stacey M Leyton

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Andrew Edward Kushner

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

 

Court Documents

15 #3

Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Intervene

15 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor-Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters. Motion set for hearing on 3/9/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene, #2 Declaration of Bradley Raymond in Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Intervene) (Leyton, Stacey) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#14

(#14) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew Edward Kushner counsel for Intervenor Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters. Adding Andrew E. Kushner as counsel of record for International Brotherhood of Teamsters for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Intervenor-Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Attorney Andrew Edward Kushner added to party International Brotherhood of Teamsters(pty:intvd))(Kushner, Andrew) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#13

(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stacey M Leyton counsel for Intervenor Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters. Adding Stacey M. Leyton as counsel of record for International Brotherhood of Teamsters for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Intervenor-Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Attorney Stacey M Leyton added to party International Brotherhood of Teamsters(pty:intvd))(Leyton, Stacey) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#12

(#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Christina A. Snyder:Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten (10) Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby DISMISSES Doe Defendants 11 through 50, inclusive (lc) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulation: Extending time to answer (30 days or Less). Other error(s) with document(s): Case number missing division and assigned Magistrate. Correct case number is to read as: 5:19cv02447 CAS (KKx). Re incorrect event used...no Extension of time was recorded on case docket. The cited correct event would have done so. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Filer failed to include Court division on official case number. Correct case number is to read as: 5:19cv02447 CAS (KKx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Respond to initial complaint by not more than 30 days filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra.(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda on behalf of Defendant Xavier Becerra (Attorney Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft))(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#7

(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Western States Trucking Association, upon Defendant Xavier Becerra served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon A. Barnes, Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Whalen, Patrick) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#6

(#6) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Xavier Becerra. (esa) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (esa) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Western States Trucking Association. (Whalen, Patrick) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Western States Trucking Association. (Whalen, Patrick) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24986956 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Western States Trucking Association. (Attorney Patrick James Whalen added to party Western States Trucking Association(pty:bkmov))(Whalen, Patrick) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor-Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters. Motion set for hearing on 3/9/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene, #2 Declaration of Bradley Raymond in Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Intervene) (Leyton, Stacey) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew Edward Kushner counsel for Intervenor Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters. Adding Andrew E. Kushner as counsel of record for International Brotherhood of Teamsters for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Intervenor-Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Attorney Andrew Edward Kushner added to party International Brotherhood of Teamsters(pty:intvd))(Kushner, Andrew) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stacey M Leyton counsel for Intervenor Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters. Adding Stacey M. Leyton as counsel of record for International Brotherhood of Teamsters for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Intervenor-Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Attorney Stacey M Leyton added to party International Brotherhood of Teamsters(pty:intvd))(Leyton, Stacey) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Christina A. Snyder:Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten (10) Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby DISMISSES Doe Defendants 11 through 50, inclusive (lc) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulation: Extending time to answer (30 days or Less). Other error(s) with document(s): Case number missing division and assigned Magistrate. Correct case number is to read as: 5:19cv02447 CAS (KKx). Re incorrect event used...no Extension of time was recorded on case docket. The cited correct event would have done so. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Filer failed to include Court division on official case number. Correct case number is to read as: 5:19cv02447 CAS (KKx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Respond to initial complaint by not more than 30 days filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra.(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda on behalf of Defendant Xavier Becerra (Attorney Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft))(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Western States Trucking Association, upon Defendant Xavier Becerra served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon A. Barnes, Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Whalen, Patrick) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Xavier Becerra. (esa) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (esa) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Western States Trucking Association. (Whalen, Patrick) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Western States Trucking Association. (Whalen, Patrick) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24986956 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Western States Trucking Association. (Attorney Patrick James Whalen added to party Western States Trucking Association(pty:bkmov))(Whalen, Patrick) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.