This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/26/2021 at 08:56:13 (UTC).

Western States Office and Professional Employees Pension Fund et al v. Communications Workers of America Local 7019

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 Western States Office and Professional Employees Pension Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Communications Workers of America Local 7019. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael W. Mosman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00634

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Mosman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Board of Trustees of Western States Office and Professional Employees Pension Fund

WSOPE Western States Office and Professional Employees Pension Fund

Western States Office and Professional Employees Pension Fund

Defendant

Communications Workers of America Local 7019

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dylan Jensen

Attorney at Bennett Hartman, LLP

210 Sw Morrison Street, Suite 500

Portland, OR 97204

Linda J. Larkin

Attorney at Bennett Hartman Morris & Kaplan LLP

210 Sw Morrison Street, Suite 500

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

#3

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued Electronically as to Communications Workers of America Local 7019. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #3 Proposed Summons. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The PDF document attached was not flattened, and was missing the case number. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. (cw) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Amended Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Jensen, Dylan) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/3/2021) (cw). (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/26/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/27/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 9/27/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (sb) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8059160 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Board of Trustees of Western States Office and Professional Employees Pension Fund, Western States Office and Professional Employees Pension Fund against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Western States is a litigant

Latest cases where Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO is a litigant

Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda J. Larkin